Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3216625

EP3216625 - PNEUMATIC RADIAL TIRE FOR A PASSENGER VEHICLE AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.06.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2017/37]
Inventor(s)01 / KUWAYAMA, Isao
c/o Bridgestone Corporation Technical Center
3-1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho
Kodaira-shi
Tokyo, Tokyo 187-8531 / JP
02 / MATSUMOTO, Hiroyuki
c/o Bridgestone Corporation Technical Center
3-1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho
Kodaira-shi, Tokyo 187-8531 / JP
03 / HATANAKA, Shintaro
c/o Bridgestone Corporation
Technical Center
3-1-1 Ogawahigashi-cho
Kodaira-shi, Tokyo 187-8531 / JP
 [2017/37]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[2019/32]
Former [2017/37]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date17165442.924.08.2012
[2017/37]
Priority number, dateJP2011018517826.08.2011         Original published format: JP 2011185178
JP2011018519526.08.2011         Original published format: JP 2011185195
JP2011018527926.08.2011         Original published format: JP 2011185279
[2017/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3216625
Date:13.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3216625
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60C3/04, B60C13/00, B60C15/06
[2017/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/37]
TitleGerman:RADIALLUFTREIFEN FÜR EIN PASSAGIERFAHRZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON[2017/37]
English:PNEUMATIC RADIAL TIRE FOR A PASSENGER VEHICLE AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME[2017/37]
French:PNEU RADIAL POUR VÉHICULE DE TOURISME ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION[2017/37]
Examination procedure07.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/37]
07.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2019Fee for grant paid
27.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12828739.8  / EP2810790
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
07.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
28.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP2000190706  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0010] - [0017] - [0047]; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [Y]JPH04108003  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 1-4 * figures 1,2; claims 1-4; table 2 *;
 [Y]EP0890452  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * figure 4; claim 1; table 1 *;
 [A]US5186772  (NAKASAKI EIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * claim 1 *
ExaminationJP2006160106
by applicantJPH0740706
 EP20120828739