Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3231281

EP3231281 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOCATING AN OBJECT USING A RECEIVER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.03.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2018First examination reportpublished on 23.05.2018 [2018/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IoAgrit Oy
Rengaskuja 6
21410 Vanhalinna / FI
[2017/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Kangas, Arto
Silkkikatu 1 a
20660 Littoinen / FI
02 / Fahllund, Jan
Verkaranta 7 E33
20660 Lieto / FI
03 / Mäkinen, Samuli
Esterinkatu 16 as 5
24100 Salo / FI
04 / Virta, Anssi
Metsäpirtinkatu 13b12
20740 Turku / FI
05 / Kangas, Harri
Kiramonkatu 5c7
33410 Tampere / FI
 [2017/42]
Representative(s)Suominen, Kaisa Liisa
Moosedog Oy
Rykmentintie 2B
20810 Turku / FI
[2017/42]
Application number, filing date17165473.407.04.2017
[2017/42]
Priority number, dateFI2016000531813.04.2016         Original published format: FI 20165318
[2017/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3231281
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:A01K11/00, A01K29/00
[2017/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/15]
Former [2017/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ORTUNG EINES OBJEKTS MIT EINER EMPFÄNGERVORRICHTUNG[2017/42]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOCATING AN OBJECT USING A RECEIVER DEVICE[2017/42]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LOCALISER UN OBJET AU MOYEN D'UN DISPOSITIF RÉCEPTEUR[2017/42]
Examination procedure07.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/15]
18.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2014333439  (DOWNING MARK L [US], et al) [X] 5-8 * paragraphs [0037] , [0045] , [0048] , [0049] , [0053]; figures 1-9 * [Y] 1-4;
 [XI]FR2964777  (ASSERVA [FR]) [X] 5-8 * page 3, line 13 - page 6, line 23; figures 1-3 * [I] 1-4;
 [XI]US2012112917  (MENACHEM URI BEN [IL], et al) [X] 5,6 * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] - [0042] , [0043]; figures 1-4 * [I] 1-4,7,8;
 [XAI]US7830257  (HASSELL JOHN W [US]) [X] 5,8 * column 2, line 4 - column 6, line 29; figures 1-9 * [A] 1-4 [I] 6,7;
 [Y]US2008204255  (FLEXER HAGAI [IL], et al) [Y] 1-4 * paragraph [0064]; figures 1-5 *