Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3231721

EP3231721 - MACHINE FOR PRODUCTION OF CRATE-TYPE PACKAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Change - classificationpublished on 14.11.2018 [2018/46]
12.10.2018Change - classificationpublished on 14.11.2018 [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cintio, Maria Teresa
Via San Marziale, 104
63848 Petritoli (FM) / IT
[2017/42]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2017/42]
Representative(s)Baldi, Claudio
Ing. Claudio Baldi S.r.l.
Viale Cavallotti, 13
60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT
[2017/42]
Application number, filing date17166253.912.04.2017
[2017/42]
Priority number, dateIT2016UA0260914.04.2016         Original published format: IT UA20162609
[2017/42]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3231721
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:B65D5/00, B65D5/42, B31B50/44, B31B50/68
[2017/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/22]
Former [2017/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERPACKUNGSSTEIGEN[2017/42]
English:MACHINE FOR PRODUCTION OF CRATE-TYPE PACKAGING[2017/42]
French:MACHINE POUR LA PRODUCTION DES CAISSES D' EMBALLAGE[2017/42]
Examination procedure12.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.04.2018Examination requested  [2018/22]
Documents cited:Search[IY]US3583295  (ELDER STANLEY C, et al) [I] 1,4,5 * column 6, line 36 - column 9, line 54; figures 1-11 * [Y] 2,3,6-9;
 [Y]GB1164541  (BOWATER PACKAGING LTD [GB]) [Y] 2,3,6,7 * page 3, line 24 - line 30; figures 1-3 * * page 4, line 71 - line 86 *;
 [A]WO2013065025  (EUROPROGETTI SRL [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE2450702  (VERBOORD HENDRIKUS PETRUS) [Y] 6,7 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0237396  (NACELLE SARL [FR]) [Y] 6,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5673848  (GARZA JUAN RAMON [MX]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 5 - line 10; figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE2819000  (MECCANICA V D DI VALENTI DANTE) [Y] 8 * page 12, paragraph l; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US3186244  (BAKER THOMAS R, et al) [Y] 9 * page 1, line 51 - line 54 *