EP3388744 - SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR RECYCLING FLUIDIZED BOILER BED MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Improbed AB Carl Gustafs väg 4 20509 Malmö / SE | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISRAELSSON, Mikael Källsprangsgatan 1 41320 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
ANDERSSON, Bengt-Ake Lövskogsvägen 62 43537 Mölnlycke / SE | 03 /
BIERLEIN, Lars Helmfeltsgatan 4a 21148 Malmö / SE | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/42] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 17166323.0 | 12.04.2017 | [2018/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3388744 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3388744 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F23C10/26, F23J3/06, F23C10/01 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
F23J3/06 (EP,US);
F23C10/01 (EP,US);
F23C10/26 (EP,US);
F23C2206/102 (US);
F23C2900/10001 (EP,US);
F23C2900/10004 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] |
Former [2018/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM RECYCLING VON WIRBELSCHICHTKESSELMATERIAL | [2018/42] | English: | SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR RECYCLING FLUIDIZED BOILER BED MATERIAL | [2018/42] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE RECYCLAGE DE MATÉRIAU DE LIT DE CHAUDIÈRE FLUIDISÉE | [2018/42] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 15.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.04.2017 | AL | 30.10.2019 | CY | 30.10.2019 | CZ | 30.10.2019 | EE | 30.10.2019 | ES | 30.10.2019 | HR | 30.10.2019 | LT | 30.10.2019 | LV | 30.10.2019 | MC | 30.10.2019 | MK | 30.10.2019 | MT | 30.10.2019 | NL | 30.10.2019 | RO | 30.10.2019 | RS | 30.10.2019 | SI | 30.10.2019 | SK | 30.10.2019 | SM | 30.10.2019 | TR | 30.10.2019 | BG | 30.01.2020 | NO | 30.01.2020 | GR | 31.01.2020 | IS | 29.02.2020 | PT | 02.03.2020 | IE | 12.04.2020 | LU | 12.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.04.2017 | |
AL | 30.10.2019 | ||
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
MT | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
TR | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
IE | 12.04.2020 | ||
LU | 12.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
IE | 12.04.2020 | ||
LU | 12.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
LU | 12.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
LU | 12.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | HR | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | LT | 30.10.2019 | |
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | LT | 30.10.2019 | |
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 30.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003262320 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0002]; figure 3 *; | [A]DE10341610 (LURGI AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0001]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0014] *; | [A]EP3106531 (IMPROBED AB [SE]) [A] 12-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005]; figures 1,2 *; | [E]EP3153776 (IMPROBED AB [SE]) [E] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0007]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] ** paragraphs [0019] , [0021] , [0028] * | by applicant | - H. THUNMAN ET AL., FUEL, (2013), vol. 113, pages 300 - 309 |