blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3236013

EP3236013 - ARTICLE, COMPONENT, AND METHOD OF MAKING A COMPONENT OF A GAS TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.01.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.11.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.07.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.03.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.05.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 03.04.2024  [2024/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Technology GmbH
Brown Boveri Strasse 8
5400 Baden / CH
[2024/14]
Former [2023/50]For all designated states
General Electric Technology GmbH
Brown Boveri Strasse 8
5400 Baden / CH
Former [2017/43]For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WEBER, Joseph Anthony
300 Garlington Road
Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US
02 / KOTTILINGAM, Srikanth Chandrudu
300 Garlington Road
Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US
03 / TOLLISON, Brian Lee
300 Garlington Road
Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)Novagraaf Group
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / Geneva / CH
[2024/14]
Former [2017/43]Williams, Andrew Richard
GE International Inc.
GPO-Europe The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
Application number, filing date17166868.418.04.2017
[2017/43]
Priority number, dateUS20161513475821.04.2016         Original published format: US201615134758
[2017/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3236013
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3236013
Date:03.04.2024
Language:EN
[2024/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.2017
ClassificationIPC:F01D9/02, F01D25/00, F01D5/04
[2017/43]
CPC:
F01D9/02 (EP,US); F01D25/005 (EP,CN,US); F01D25/00 (CN);
F01D25/08 (CN); F01D5/041 (EP,US); F05D2220/32 (EP,US);
F05D2230/22 (EP,US); F05D2230/237 (EP,CN,US); F05D2230/80 (EP,US);
F05D2230/90 (EP,CN,US); F05D2240/12 (EP,US); F05D2240/128 (EP,US);
F05D2240/15 (EP,US); F05D2240/80 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/23]
Former [2017/43]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ARTIKEL, KOMPONENTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KOMPONENTE EINES GASTURBINENTRIEBWERKS[2017/43]
English:ARTICLE, COMPONENT, AND METHOD OF MAKING A COMPONENT OF A GAS TURBINE ENGINE[2017/43]
French:ARTICLE, COMPOSANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSANT D'UN MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ[2017/43]
Examination procedure18.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.04.2018Examination requested  [2018/23]
16.03.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.08.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2023Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
08.01.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2024Fee for grant paid
27.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
21.04.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
20.04.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
20.04.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB2071777  (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 67 - page 2, line 127; figures 1-4; claims 1-4 * [Y] 10;
 [XY]EP1977852  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0013]; figures 1-6; claims 1-6,8-12 * [Y] 10;
 [XY]EP2412930  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1-8; claims 1,3,8,10 * [Y] 10;
 [XA]EP2949418  (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-6; claims 1-7 *[A] 10;
 [X]US2015375322  (SALM JACOB ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-5; claims 12,16,17-20 *;
 [XA]US2016067836  (HUXOL JASON [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1-8; claims 1,6,7,9 * [A] 10
ExaminationUS4185369
 FR2953885
 WO2015075233
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.