Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3392868

EP3392868 - DISPLAY DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.04.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.04.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.09.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
For all designated states
Ozyegin Universitesi
Nisantepe Mah. Orman Sk. No:34-36
Alemdag Cekmekoy
34794 Istanbul / TR
[2018/43]
Inventor(s)01 / MEMISOGLU, Gorkem
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
02 / GULBAHAR, Burhan
Özyegin Üniversitesi
Nisantepe Mah., Orman Sok.
34794 Çekmeköy/Istanbul / TR
 [2018/43]
Representative(s)Ascherl, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2018/43]
Application number, filing date17167105.019.04.2017
[2018/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3392868
Date:24.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/3225, G09G3/34
[2018/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/19]
Former [2018/43]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN DER ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG[2018/43]
English:DISPLAY DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A DISPLAY DEVICE[2018/43]
French:DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENTET DE DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE[2018/43]
Examination procedure28.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/19]
28.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2016320887  (LI GUOSHENG [CN], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1-8 * [Y] 5,7,12,14;
 [XY]US2014132158  (LAND BRIAN R [US], et al) [X] 1,4,8,11 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0061]; figures 1-8 * [Y] 5,7,12,14;
 [XY]US2014152632  (SHEDLETSKY ANNA-KATRINA [US], et al) [X] 1,4,8,11 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0064]; figures 1-7 * [Y] 5-7,12-14;
 [Y]US2014216174  (ABERG PETER [SE], et al) [Y] 5,6,12,13 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041]; figures 3,4 *;
 [Y]US2008252572  (KANG KINYENG [KR], et al) [Y] 7,14 * paragraph [0037] *
by applicantUS2012021828