Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3392993

EP3392993 - ELECTROSTATIC DISCHARGE PROTECTION CIRCUIT AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
03.05.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 05.06.2019  [2019/23]
03.05.2019Change - designated statespublished on 05.06.2019  [2019/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2018/43]
Inventor(s)01 / ÖZBAY, Mustafa Caner
C/O Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
02 / DERELI, Ulas
C/O Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2018/43]
Representative(s)Flint, Adam
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2018/43]
Application number, filing date17167153.019.04.2017
[2018/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3392993
Date:24.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:H02H9/04, H02H1/00
[2018/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/23]
Former [2018/43]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHUTZSCHALTUNG FÜR ELEKTROSTATISCHE ENTLADUNGEN UND VORRICHTUNG[2018/43]
English:ELECTROSTATIC DISCHARGE PROTECTION CIRCUIT AND DEVICE[2018/43]
French:CIRCUIT ET DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES DÉCHARGES ÉLECTROSTATIQUES[2018/43]
Examination procedure24.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/23]
24.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2015070807  (BAEK JONG-JIN [KR] ET AL) [X] 1,3-5,7-9,11,12 * paragraphs [0003] - [0008] - [0 13] , [0 24] - [0029] - [0 31] , [0 40]; figures 1-3; claim 11 * [I] 2,6,10;
 [XI]US2010315754  (KER MING-DOU [TW] ET AL) [X] 1,3-5,7-9,11,12 * paragraphs [0030] - [0039]; figures 1-3 * [I] 2,6,10;
 [A]US2017063080  (IKEDA MASUHIDE [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *