Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3239813

EP3239813 - DISPLAY APPARATUS FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.01.2020
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.02.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020(Expected) grantpublished on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-Gu
Seoul
07336 / KR
[2017/44]
Inventor(s)01 / YOUN, Jinho
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil, Seocho-gu
06772 Seoul / KR
02 / CHOI, Jaehyeuck
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil, Seocho-gu
06772 Seoul / KR
03 / HWANG, Hyokune
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil, Seocho-gu
06772 Seoul / KR
 [2017/44]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2017/44]
Application number, filing date17167466.621.04.2017
[2017/44]
Priority number, dateKR2016005029925.04.2016         Original published format: KR 20160050299
[2017/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3239813
Date:01.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/44]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3239813
Date:26.02.2020
Language:EN
[2020/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/01, B60K37/00, G06F3/042
[2017/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/20]
Former [2017/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG[2017/44]
English:DISPLAY APPARATUS FOR VEHICLE[2017/44]
French:AFFICHEUR POUR VÉHICULE[2017/44]
Examination procedure21.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/44]
21.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
06.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2020Fee for grant paid
16.01.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.01.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2011221696  (WAELLER CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,7,11-14 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraphs [0038] - [0055]; figures 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 * [I] 2,3,5,6,8-10,15;
 [X]EP2937765  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,11-14 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraphs [0018] - [0027] * * paragraphs [0039] - [0056] * * paragraphs [0057] , [0 63] - [0066] * * paragraphs [0079] - [0086] * * paragraphs [0097] - [0103] * * paragraph [0119] *