Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3217341

EP3217341 - MESSAGE USER INTERFACES FOR CAPTURE AND TRANSMITTAL OF MEDIA AND LOCATION CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino CA 95014 / US
[2018/31]
Former [2017/37]For all designated states
Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Inventor(s)01 / YANG, Lawrence Y.
Apple Inc.
P.O. Box 95014
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA California / US
02 / CHAUDHRI, Imran
57 Beaumont
San Francisco, CA California 94118 / US
03 / GARCIA, Roberto
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US
04 / WOOD, Justin N.
1 Infinite Loop
Mail Stop 303-1 NS
Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US
05 / LEMAY, Stephen, Olivier
1121 Lincoln Ave.
Palo Alto, CA California 94301 / US
06 / Dellinger, Richard R.
Apple Inc
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA California CA 95014 / US
07 / Coffman, Patrick L.
Apple Inc
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA California CA 95014 / US
08 / Krenn, Matthaeus
Apple Inc
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA California CA 95014 / US
 [2017/37]
Representative(s)Barton, Russell Glen
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[2017/37]
Application number, filing date17167629.922.05.2015
[2017/37]
Priority number, dateUS201462006071P31.05.2014         Original published format: US 201462006071 P
US201462047622P08.09.2014         Original published format: US 201462047622 P
US20141450338630.09.2014         Original published format: US201414503386
US20141450337630.09.2014         Original published format: US201414503376
US20141450335530.09.2014         Original published format: US201414503355
[2017/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3217341
Date:13.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/10, G06F3/01
[2017/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/37]
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:NACHRICHTENBENUTZEROBERFLÄCHEN ZUR ERFASSUNG UND ÜBERMITTLUNG VON MEDIEN- UND STANDORTINHALT[2017/37]
English:MESSAGE USER INTERFACES FOR CAPTURE AND TRANSMITTAL OF MEDIA AND LOCATION CONTENT[2017/37]
French:INTERFACES UTILISATEUR DE MESSAGE POUR LA CAPTURE ET LA TRANSMISSION D'UN CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA ET DE LOCALISATION[2017/37]
Examination procedure21.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/37]
21.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15728307.8  / EP3108422
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2009071112  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [I] 1-16 * page 6, line 5 - page 8, line 6 * * page 11, line 18 - page 13, line 7 * * figure 6 *
by applicantUS7657849
 US6323846
 US6570557
 US6677932
 US2002015024
 US2005190059
 US2006017692
 US20060381313
 US20040840862
 US20040903964
 US20050048264
 US20050038590
 US20050228758
 US20050228700
 US20050228737
 US20060367749
 US20060586862
 US20060638251
 US20070936562
 US20070968067
 WO2013US40061
 WO2013US69483