Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3396394

EP3396394 - A MEMRISTOR BASED SYSTEM FOR DETECTING POOR-CONTACT OF SOCKETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.04.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2018/44]
Inventor(s)01 / ÖZKÜÇÜK, Serhat
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2018/44]
Representative(s)Ascherl, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2018/44]
Application number, filing date17168005.125.04.2017
[2018/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3396394
Date:31.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3396394
Date:27.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/04
[2018/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/20]
Former [2018/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:AUF MEMRISTOR BASIERENDES SYSTEM ZUR ERKENNUNG VON MANGELHAFTEN BUCHSENKONTAKTEN[2018/44]
English:A MEMRISTOR BASED SYSTEM FOR DETECTING POOR-CONTACT OF SOCKETS[2018/44]
French:SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION DE MAUVAIS CONTACT DE PRISES À BASE DE MEMRISTANCE[2018/44]
Examination procedure08.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/20]
08.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2019Fee for grant paid
22.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US2016178682  (ELDRIDGE DAVID AUSTIN [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2015038664  (MOLEX INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102014116298  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
by applicantCN104505669
 US6236171