Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3335642

EP3335642 - APPARATUS FOR FORMING A SELF-LOCKING ADJUSTABLE LOOP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.12.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 30.01.2019  [2019/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Sports Medicine, LLC
56 E. Bell Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
[2018/25]
Inventor(s)01 / DENHAM, Gregory J.
3348 North Hickory Court
Warsaw, IN Indiana 46582 / US
02 / STONE, Kevin T.
2615 Harmony Court
Winona Lake, IN Indiana 46590 / US
03 / WAGNER, Zachary
19215 Morrison Way
Noblesville, IN Indiana 46060 / US
 [2018/25]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2018/25]
Application number, filing date17169003.531.10.2012
[2018/25]
Priority number, dateUS20111328845903.11.2011         Original published format: US201113288459
US20111328846303.11.2011         Original published format: US201113288463
[2018/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3335642
Date:20.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/04, A61B17/06
[2018/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/05]
Former [2018/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SELBSTVERRIEGELNDEN EINSTELLBAREN KREISES[2018/25]
English:APPARATUS FOR FORMING A SELF-LOCKING ADJUSTABLE LOOP[2018/25]
French:APPAREIL POUR FORMER UNE BOUCLE AJUSTABLE À VERROUILLAGE AUTOMATIQUE[2018/25]
Examination procedure19.09.2017Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
06.11.2017Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
19.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/05]
19.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12791902.5  / EP2775935
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
17.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US2003065402  (ANDERSON KIMBERLY A [US] ET AL) [X] 12-15 * paragraphs [0096] - [0097]; figure 15 *;
 [I]US330087  (LEEDHAM BINNS) [I] 12-15 * column 2; figures 1-5 *;
 [I]US5699657  (PAULSON WILLIAM THOMAS [US]) [I] 12-15 * column 8, lines 22-39; figure 14 *;
 [A]US2009318961  (STONE KEVIN T [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0063]; figure 25 *;
 [A]US2011264141  (DENHAM GREGORY J [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0039]; figures 1,12 *;
 [A]US5577299  (THOMPSON CARL W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS7601165
 US2010211075
 US2011106153