Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3239518

EP3239518 - WAVE ENERGY CONVERSION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.09.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.05.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Moffat, Brian Lee
3440 Corpus Christi Street
Simi Valley, CA 93063-1408 / US
[2017/44]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2017/44]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/44]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
Alpha Tower
Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date17169133.027.03.2009
[2017/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3239518
Date:01.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:F03B13/20, F03B13/22
[2017/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/23]
Former [2017/44]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:WELLENENERGIEUMWANDLER[2017/44]
English:WAVE ENERGY CONVERSION APPARATUS[2017/44]
French:APPAREIL DE CONVERSION D'ÉNERGIE DES VAGUES[2017/44]
Examination procedure02.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.04.2018Examination requested  [2018/23]
01.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.09.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09842427.8  / EP2411662
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[A]WO8911036  (ONDE MARCEL [FR]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 23 *;
 [A]US4447740  (HECK LOUIS J [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6291904  (CARROLL CHARLES B [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 5, lines 50-59; figure 4 * * column 7, lines 30-63 *;
 [A]JPS61261677  (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO) [A] 1-17 * abstract *