Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3244399

EP3244399 - SOUND PROCESSING SYSTEM AND SIGNAL PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2017/46]SOUND PROCESSING SYSTEM AND ANALOGUE SIGNAL PROCESSING DEVICE
[2019/10]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.02.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.09.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.05.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yamaha Corporation
10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP
[2018/31]
Former [2017/46]For all designated states
YAMAHA CORPORATION
10-1, Nakazawa-cho
Naka-ku
430-8650 Shizuoka Hamamatsu-shi / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NAGASAWA, Tetsuya
c/o Yamaha Corporation
10-1, Nakazawa-cho
Naka-ku
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP
 [2019/11]
Former [2017/46]01 / NAGASAWA, Tetsuya
Yamaha Corporation
10-1, Nakazawa-cho
Naka-ku
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP
Representative(s)Ettmayr, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2017/46]
Application number, filing date17169484.704.05.2017
[2017/46]
Priority number, dateJP20160095217U11.05.2016         Original published format: JP 2016095217 U
JP2017007385603.04.2017         Original published format: JP 2017073856
[2017/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3244399
Date:15.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3244399
Date:13.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:G10H1/00, G10H1/46, H04H60/05, H04R3/12
[2017/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/25]
Former [2017/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:TONVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM UND SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2019/10]
English:SOUND PROCESSING SYSTEM AND SIGNAL PROCESSING DEVICE[2019/10]
French:SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE SON ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL[2019/10]
Former [2017/46]TONVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM UND ANALOGE SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG
Former [2017/46]SOUND PROCESSING SYSTEM AND ANALOGUE SIGNAL PROCESSING DEVICE
Former [2017/46]SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE SON ET DISPOSITIF ANALOGIQUE DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL
Examination procedure04.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/25]
14.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2019Fee for grant paid
18.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
PL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
SM13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
PT13.07.2019
[2019/52]
Former [2019/51]AL13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
SM13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2019/49]AL13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2019/48]ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2019/47]ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
IT13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
NO13.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
NO13.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[XAI]JP2014204205  (YAMAHA CORP) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0054] * [A] 7-10 [I] 3-6;
 [XA]US2009282967  (SKILLINGS STEVE [US]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * [A] 7-10;
 [X]WO0106751  (SERCONET LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [XI]JP2014107658  (YAMAHA CORP) [X] 2,3 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * [I] 1;
 [XI]US2003059067  (SHIBATA KOICHIRO [JP]) [X] 2 * abstract * [I] 1;
 [A]US2013329900  (PRICE WILLIAM R [US]) [A] 7-10 * abstract *;
 [A]US2007256549  (YAMADA YASUYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0052] *
by applicantUS8119900