Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3222218

EP3222218 - ENDOSCOPIC TISSUE REMOVAL APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  31.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covidien LP
Mailstop 8 N-1
555 Long Wharf Drive
New Haven, CT 06511 / US
[2017/39]
Inventor(s)01 / ORBAN, Joseph P.
78 Fillow Street
Norwalk, CT 06850 / US
 [2017/39]
Representative(s)Maschio, Antonio
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
[2017/39]
Application number, filing date17169991.116.03.2004
[2017/39]
Priority number, dateUS20030455261P17.03.2003         Original published format: US 455261 P
[2017/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3222218
Date:27.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B10/04, A61B17/22, A61B17/3205
[2017/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2018/17]
Former [2017/39]DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IE,  IT 
TitleGerman:ENDOSKOPISCHE GEWEBEENTFERNUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN[2017/39]
English:ENDOSCOPIC TISSUE REMOVAL APPARATUS AND METHOD[2017/39]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE RETRAIT DE TISSU ENDOSCOPIQUE[2017/39]
Examination procedure08.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04757505.5  / EP1603452
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
22.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 16
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO0211627  (INCEPT LLC [US]) [X] 1-7,9-12 * page 6, lines 10-23 * * page 16, lines 13-24 * * page 32, lines 7-31 * * figures 2A, 12 * [A] 8,13;
 [XI]US5735289  (PFEFFER HERBERT G [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 40-60 * * column 4, lines 20-43 * * column 6, lines 32-54 * * figures 1, 6 * [I] 2-7,9-12;
 [A]US5630822  (HERMANN GEORGE D [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6270505  (YOSHIDA OSAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE9218154U  (KERNFORSCHUNGSZ KARLSRUHE [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5465731
 US5647372