Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3299978

EP3299978 - AGREEMENT COMPLIANCE CONTROLLED INFORMATION THROTTLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.11.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR, HR, LV, RS
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eturi Corp.
12255 El Camino Real, Suite 125
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
[2018/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Moussavian, Negeen
P.O. Box 9663
Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 / US
02 / Moussavian, Amir
P.O. Box 9663
Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 / US
03 / Badiee, Ben
P.O. Box 3111
La Jolla, CA 92038 / US
04 / Lewis, Mark
P.O. Box 3111
La Jolla, CA 92038 / US
 [2018/13]
Representative(s)Purdylucey Intellectual Property
6-7 Harcourt Terrace
D02 FH73 Dublin 2 / IE
[2019/39]
Former [2018/13]Lucey, Michael
PurdyLucey
Intellectual Property
6-7 Harcourt Terrace
Dublin 2 / IE
Application number, filing date17170287.109.07.2013
[2018/13]
Priority number, dateUS201261669541P09.07.2012         Original published format: US 201261669541 P
US20121356813507.08.2012         Original published format: US201213568135
[2018/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3299978
Date:28.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3299978
Date:16.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3299978
Date:25.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/00, G06Q99/00, G06Q50/20, H04N21/442, H04N21/478, H04N21/4788
[2018/20]
Former International [2018/13]G06F21/00, G06Q99/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/52]
Former [2018/13]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:MITTELS VEREINBARUNGSKONFORMITÄT GESTEUERTE INFORMATIONSDROSSELUNG[2018/13]
English:AGREEMENT COMPLIANCE CONTROLLED INFORMATION THROTTLE[2018/13]
French:LIMITATION D'INFORMATIONS COMMANDÉE PAR CONFORMITÉ À UN CONTRAT[2018/13]
Examination procedure16.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.11.2018Examination requested  [2018/52]
16.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.2019Fee for grant paid
14.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13816695.4  / EP2870560
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
08.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI25.09.2019
HR25.09.2019
LT25.09.2019
LV25.09.2019
RS25.09.2019
SE25.09.2019
BG25.12.2019
NO25.12.2019
GR26.12.2019
[2020/12]
Former [2020/10]FI25.09.2019
LT25.09.2019
SE25.09.2019
BG25.12.2019
NO25.12.2019
Former [2020/09]FI25.09.2019
LT25.09.2019
NO25.12.2019
Former [2020/08]LT25.09.2019
NO25.12.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2012108200  (RUBIN ANDREW E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,10 * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [ 0009] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraphs [0038] , [ 0046] , [000 ] , [0081] , [ 0091] * [I] 9;
 [XI]US2008229233  (BLATTNER PATRICK D [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0009] , [0030] , [0035] * [I] 2-4,7,9,10;
 [I]EP1090492  (JACOBSON FAMILY HOLDINGS LLC [US]) [I] 1-4,7,9,10 * paragraphs [0017] , [0078] * * abstract *;
 [IA]US2010216509  (RIEMER MICHAEL S [US], et al) [I] 1-4,7-10,13,15 * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraphs [0002] , [0037] , [0089] * [A] 11,14