Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3401895

EP3401895 - LIVE BROADCASTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 19.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
For all designated states
Ozyegin Universitesi
Nisantepe Mah. Orman Sk. No:34-36
Alemdag Cekmekoy
34794 Istanbul / TR
[2018/46]
Inventor(s)01 / GULBAHAR, Burhan
Özyegin Üniversitesi
Nisantepe Mah., Orman Sok.
34794 Çekmeköy/Istanbul / TR
02 / MEMISOGLU, Gorkem
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2018/46]
Representative(s)Ascherl, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2018/46]
Application number, filing date17170348.110.05.2017
[2018/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3401895
Date:14.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G09F21/08, G09F19/18, G03B17/54, H04N5/225
[2018/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/25]
Former [2018/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LIVE-RUNDFUNKSYSTEM[2018/46]
English:LIVE BROADCASTING SYSTEM[2018/46]
French:SYSTÈME DE DIFFUSION EN DIRECT[2018/46]
Examination procedure07.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/25]
07.05.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2001040671  (METCALF DARRELL J [US]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0072] *;
 [I]WO0165861  (ROANE JERRY M [US]) [I] 1-14 * page 2, lines 5-21 * * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 13 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2007149281  (GADDA CHRIS [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0124] * * paragraph [0131] - paragraph [0132] * * paragraph [0177] *;
 [A]US2009079942  (LEE SUNG-HA [KR] ET AL) [A] 8,9 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0077] *;
 [A]  - GROBE LIANE ET AL, "High-speed visible light communication systems", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, vol. 51, no. 12, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2013.6685758, ISSN 0163-6804, (20131201), pages 60 - 66, (20131216), XP011534246 [A] 11-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2013.6685758