Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3248459

EP3248459 - DEVICE FOR KEEPING ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 19.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.02.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.05.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honerkamp's Bauernmarkt KG
Herforder Straße 70
49328 Melle-Westhoyel / DE
[2019/28]
Former [2017/48]For all designated states
Honerkamp's Bauernmarket KG
Herforder Straße 70
49328 Melle-Westhoyel / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Honerkamp, Klaus
Herforder Straße 70
49328 Melle-Westhoyel / DE
 [2017/48]
Representative(s)Jabbusch, Matthias
Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 85
26131 Oldenburg / DE
[2017/48]
Application number, filing date17172458.623.05.2017
[2017/48]
Priority number, dateDE201620102784U25.05.2016         Original published format: DE 202016102784 U
[2017/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3248459
Date:29.11.2017
Language:DE
[2017/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3248459
Date:10.07.2019
Language:DE
[2019/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:A01K1/00, A01K31/22
[2017/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/26]
Former [2017/48]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM HALTEN VON TIEREN[2017/48]
English:DEVICE FOR KEEPING ANIMALS[2017/48]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ÉLEVAGE POUR BÉTAILS[2017/48]
Examination procedure23.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/26]
25.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.05.2019Fee for grant paid
28.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]CN105359985  (LI YANHUI) [Y] 1-4,7-15 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2608178  (KOLBER BENJAMIN M) [Y] 1-15 * column 2 - column 3; figures 1-2; claims 1-3 *;
 [Y]US1374120  (OSCAR STROMBORG FRITZ) [Y] 5,6 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2474932  (CLARK RUTH G) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4 *
by applicantDE20215638U
 EP2979541