Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3407463

EP3407463 - ENERGY SUPPLY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  26.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2018/48]
Inventor(s)01 / ERASLAN, Oguzhan
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2018/48]
Representative(s)Ascherl, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2018/48]
Application number, filing date17172561.723.05.2017
[2018/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3407463
Date:28.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:H02J7/34, H04M1/00
[2018/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ENERGIEVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM[2018/48]
English:ENERGY SUPPLY SYSTEM[2018/48]
French:SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION EN ÉNERGIE[2018/48]
Examination procedure29.05.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/44]
13.06.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2019/44]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US6628107  (BANG WILLIAM R [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,7-10 * column 1, line 6 - line 28 * * abstract * * column 3, line 14 - column 6, line 67 * [Y] 5,6 [I] 11;
 [X]EP2884616  (ZTE CORP [CN]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,14 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0 21] - [0041] *;
 [X]GB2445002  (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,12 * abstract * * page 2, line 11 - pages 6-22 *;
 [X]WO2014183734  (KRANZ VLADIMIR [CZ]) [X] 1-4,7,8,14 * pages 2-9 * * pages 26-30 *;
 [X]EP2469686  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1,7,8 * paragraphs [0015] - [0032]; figure 4 *;
 [Y]US2006220611  (CHOI WOO-SUK [KR]) [Y] 5,6 * paragraphs [0020] - [0025]; figure 1 *