Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3231401

EP3231401 - APPARATUS FOR PULLING A TENSILE MEMBER FROM A MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.07.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.08.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019New entry: Payment of fee for grant 
13.12.2019New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cardinal Health Switzerland 515 GmbH
Lindenstrasse 10
6340 Baar / CH
[2019/34]
Former [2017/42]For all designated states
Cordis Corporation
430 Route 22 East
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RINCON, Cesar
33 Union Sq Apt 212
Union City, CA 94587-3535 / US
02 / KREVER, Matthew
15 Shepard Way
Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US
03 / OLSEN, Daniel
215 Beacon Hill Road
Califon, NJ 07830 / US
04 / JOHNSON, Edward
P.O. Box 368
Skaneateles, NY 13152 / US
 [2017/42]
Representative(s)Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/42]Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date17173586.322.06.2011
[2017/42]
Priority number, dateUS20100358197P24.06.2010         Original published format: US 358197 P
[2017/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3231401
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/95
[2017/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/42]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR RETRAKTION EINES ZUGELEMENTS AUS EINER MEDIZINISCHEN VORRICHTUNG[2017/42]
English:APPARATUS FOR PULLING A TENSILE MEMBER FROM A MEDICAL DEVICE[2017/42]
French:APPAREIL DESTINÉ À TIRER UN ÉLÉMENT DE TRACTION D'UN DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL[2017/42]
Examination procedure30.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/42]
30.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2019Fee for grant paid
11.12.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.12.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11728748.2  / EP2585004
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1834610  (MEDTRONIC VASCULAR INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * figures 2,3 *;
 [X]DE19838414  (JOMED IMPLANTATE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-14 * column 2, lines 34-61; figure 1 *;
 [X]WO2007044929  (GORE ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 8, lines 11-25; figure 2 *;
 [X]WO2008034793  (ANGIOMED AG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US2002077634  (LEONHARDT HOWARD J [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 7a *;
 [XP]US2011034987  (KENNEDY KENNETH C [US]) [XP] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2009264992
 US2009270967
 US20090489738