Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3410256

EP3410256 - METHOD FOR OUTPUTTING OF COMBINED 2D AND 3D IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.10.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.11.2019  [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2018/49]
Inventor(s)01 / KIRISKEN, Barbaros
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2018/49]
Representative(s)Ascherl, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2018/49]
Application number, filing date17173868.501.06.2017
[2018/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3410256
Date:05.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/01, G06F17/50, G06T19/00
[2018/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR AUSGABE VON KOMBINIERTEN 2D- UND 3D-BILDERN[2018/49]
English:METHOD FOR OUTPUTTING OF COMBINED 2D AND 3D IMAGING[2018/49]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE UNE IMAGERIE 2D ET 3D COMBINÉE[2018/49]
Examination procedure06.06.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/45]
21.06.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2019/45]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2016027216  (DA VEIGA ALEXANDRE [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0034] - [0042] - [0044] - [0047] * [I] 9,11,12;
 [I]US9613448  (MARGOLIN BENJAMIN [US]) [I] 1-6,9,11-13 * abstract * * column 3, lines 31-67 * * column 5, lines 31-54 * * column 6, line 47 - column 8, line 20 * * column 9, lines 9-22 * * column 9, line 56 - column 10, line 9 * * column 11, line 43 - column 13, line 33 * * column 14, line 60 - column 15, line 32 *;
 [A]US2017052373  (MEMMOTT ROBERT COURTNEY [US], et al) [A] 1,7,8,10,13 * abstract *
by applicantUS2015235423