blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3240328 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3240328



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 350
15.05.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
15.05.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.05.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
19.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.04.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
19.04.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
19.04.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 15
19.04.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 15
19.04.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
19.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.11.2017 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
05.10.2017 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
28.09.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.09.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 9
28.09.2017 European search report Search / examination 2
28.09.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
20.09.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
12.09.2017 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
04.09.2017 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
28.08.2017 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
22.06.2017 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 10
22.06.2017 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 8
01.06.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.06.2017 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
01.06.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
01.06.2017 Description Search / examination 57
01.06.2017 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
01.06.2017 Drawings Search / examination 22
01.06.2017 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
16.02.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 76
16.02.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 88