Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3240328

EP3240328 - EFFICIENT DISCARD MECHANISM IN SMALL CELL DEPLOYMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.05.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.04.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sun Patent Trust
450 Lexington Avenue, 38th Floor
New York, NY 10017 / US
[2017/44]
Inventor(s)01 / BASU MALLICK, Prateek
c/o Panasonic R & D Center Germany GmbH
Monzastrasse 4c
63225 Langen / DE
02 / LOEHR, Joachim
c/o Panasonic R & D Center Germany GmbH
Monzastrasse 4c
63225 Langen / DE
 [2017/44]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2017/44]
Application number, filing date17173871.923.07.2014
[2017/44]
Priority number, dateEP2013017786424.07.2013         Original published format: EP 13177864
EP2014016778309.05.2014         Original published format: EP 14167783
[2017/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3240328
Date:01.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W28/06, // H04L12/823
[2017/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/22]
Former [2017/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:EFFIZIENTER ENTSORGUNGSMECHANISMUS BEIM EINSATZ KLEINER ZELLEN[2017/44]
English:EFFICIENT DISCARD MECHANISM IN SMALL CELL DEPLOYMENT[2017/44]
French:MÉCANISME D'ABANDON EFFICACE DANS UN DÉPLOIEMENT À PETITES CELLULES[2017/44]
Examination procedure01.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.04.2018Examination requested  [2018/22]
15.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
22.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14741913.9  / EP3025547
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
01.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[IA]  - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS (RAPPORTEUR), "Email Discussion Report on U-Plane Alternatives [81bis#19]", vol. RAN WG2, no. Fukuoka, Japan; 20130520 - 20130524, (20130510), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-131621 SCE UPLANE EMAIL DISCUSSION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_82/Docs/, (20130510), XP050699806 [I] 1,10 * page 32 - page 35 * * page 19 - page 23 * [A] 2-9,11-18
 [A]  - INTERDIGITAL COMMUNICATIONS, "User Plane Architecture for Dual-Connectivity", vol. RAN WG2, no. Fukuoka, Japan; 20130520 - 20130524, (20130511), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-131939 USER PLANE ARCHITECTURE FOR DUAL CONNECTIVITY, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FR, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_82/Docs/, (20130511), XP050700091 [A] 1-18 * Section 2.2.3 * * section 2.1 *
 [IP]  - INTEL CORPORATION, "PDCP reordering for option 3C in dual connectivity", vol. RAN WG2, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20140210 - 20140214, (20140131), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-140269, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_85/Docs/, (20140131), XP050754260 [IP] 1-18 * Section 2.3 *
 [IP]  - ERICSSON, "PDCP reordering in dual connectivity", vol. RAN WG2, no. Valencia, Spain; 20140331 - 20140404, (20140321), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-141544 - PDCP REORDERING IN DUAL CONNECTIVITY, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_85bis/Docs/, (20140321), XP050817668 [IP] 1-18 * Sections 3.1 & 3.3 *
by applicant   - STEFANIA SESIA; ISSAM TOUFIK; MATTHER BAKER, The UMTS Long Term Evolution FROM THEORY TO PRACTICE