Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3232723

EP3232723 - SYNCHRONIZED UPLINK-DOWNLINK HOP FOR MEASUREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[N/P]
Former [2017/42]For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GAAL, Peter
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
02 / BARBIERI, Alan
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/42]
Representative(s)Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2017/42]
Application number, filing date17174157.228.06.2012
[2017/42]
Priority number, dateUS201161504083P01.07.2011         Original published format: US 201161504083 P
US20121353496227.06.2012         Original published format: US201213534962
[2017/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3232723
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/08
[2017/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/42]
TitleGerman:SYNCHRONISIERTER UPLINK-DOWNLINK-SPRUNG FÜR MESSUNGEN[2017/42]
English:SYNCHRONIZED UPLINK-DOWNLINK HOP FOR MEASUREMENTS[2017/42]
French:SAUT SYNCHRONISÉ DE LIAISON MONTANTE ET DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE POUR DES MESURES[2017/42]
Examination procedure02.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/42]
02.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12735990.9  / EP2727428
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
02.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
02.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
02.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
08.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2010322185  (PARK KENNETH J [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraphs [0051] , [0054] , [0058] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0132] * * figures 1, 3, 29 *;
 [Y]WO9602979  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 1, line 5 - line 10 * * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 19 * * page 12, line 6 - page 15, line 3 * * page 20, line 4 - line 11 * * figures 3, 4 *;
 [Y]WO03094395  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 1, line 7 - line 8 * * page 4, line 17 - line 23 * * page 7, line 8 - line 14 * * page 19, line 1 - line 10 * * page 19, line 21 - page 20, line 16 * * page 22, line 23 - page 23, line 21 * * figures 2, 7 *;
 [A]WO2010088586  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0002] , [0030] , [0033] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraphs [0049] , [0051] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] * * figures 3, 4, 8 *;
 [A]WO2010111150  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0159] - paragraph [0161] * * paragraph [0169] - paragraph [0173] * * paragraph [0184] - paragraph [0189] * * figures 24, 25 *