blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3254926

EP3254926 - RAIL CLAMPING DEVICE AND TRAPPED RAIL VEHICLE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.10.2022
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.11.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.10.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.09.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.08.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.11.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Changzhou Development & Manufacture Centre Co., Ltd.
No.56, Zonglv Road
Zhonglou District
Changzhou City, Jiangsu 213002 / CN
[2017/50]
Inventor(s)01 / GAO, Jianrong
No.56, Zonglv Road, Zhonglou Distric
Changzhou City, Jiangsu 213002 / CN
02 / WANG, Meilin
No.56, Zonglv Road, Zhonglou Distric
Changzhou City, Jiangsu 213002 / CN
03 / SHI, Fahui
No.56, Zonglv Road, Zhonglou Distric
Changzhou City, Jiangsu 213002 / CN
04 / CHEN, Xinjiang
No.56, Zonglv Road, Zhonglou Distric
Changzhou City, Jiangsu 213002 / CN
05 / LEI, Peng
No.56, Zonglv Road, Zhonglou Distric
Changzhou City, Jiangsu 213002 / CN
06 / WANG, Shuchao
No.56, Zonglv Road, Zhonglou Distric
Changzhou City, Jiangsu 213002 / CN
07 / HUANG, Jianwei
No.56, Zonglv Road, Zhonglou Distric
Changzhou City, Jiangsu 213002 / CN
08 / LI, Feng
No.56, Zonglv Road, Zhonglou Distric
Changzhou City, Jiangsu 213002 / CN
 [2017/50]
Representative(s)Vitina, Maruta, et al
Agency TRIA ROBIT
P.O. Box 22
1010 Riga / LV
[2017/50]
Application number, filing date17174604.306.06.2017
[2017/50]
Priority number, dateCN20161039824407.06.2016         Original published format: CN201610398244
[2017/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3254926
Date:13.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3254926
Date:22.12.2021
Language:EN
[2021/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.2017
ClassificationIPC:B61F9/00, B61H7/12
[2017/50]
CPC:
B61F9/00 (EP); B61F11/00 (CN); B61F7/00 (CN);
B61H7/12 (EP); F16D63/008 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/50]
TitleGerman:SCHIENENKLEMMVORRICHTUNG UND EIN DAMIT BLOCKIERTES SCHIENENFAHRZEUG[2017/50]
English:RAIL CLAMPING DEVICE AND TRAPPED RAIL VEHICLE THEREOF[2017/50]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE DE RAIL ET UN VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE IMMOBILISÉ AVEC CE DISPOSITIF[2017/50]
Examination procedure06.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/50]
16.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.11.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.03.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2021Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.10.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.2021Fee for grant paid
12.11.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.11.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)23.09.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.06.2017
AL22.12.2021
AT22.12.2021
CY22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
IT22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
MC22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SI22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
IE06.06.2022
LU06.06.2022
BE30.06.2022
CH30.06.2022
FR30.06.2022
LI30.06.2022
[2024/20]
Former [2024/18]HU06.06.2017
AL22.12.2021
AT22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
IT22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
MC22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SI22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
IE06.06.2022
LU06.06.2022
BE30.06.2022
CH30.06.2022
FR30.06.2022
LI30.06.2022
Former [2023/25]AL22.12.2021
AT22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
IT22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
MC22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SI22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
IE06.06.2022
LU06.06.2022
BE30.06.2022
CH30.06.2022
FR30.06.2022
LI30.06.2022
Former [2023/22]AL22.12.2021
AT22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
MC22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SI22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
IE06.06.2022
LU06.06.2022
CH30.06.2022
FR30.06.2022
LI30.06.2022
Former [2023/21]AL22.12.2021
AT22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
MC22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SI22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
IE06.06.2022
LU06.06.2022
CH30.06.2022
LI30.06.2022
Former [2023/20]AL22.12.2021
AT22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
MC22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SI22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
IE06.06.2022
Former [2023/10]AL22.12.2021
AT22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
MC22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SI22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
Former [2023/08]AL22.12.2021
AT22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
MC22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
Former [2022/49]AL22.12.2021
AT22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
Former [2022/46]AT22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
Former [2022/42]AT22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
Former [2022/36]AT22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
PT22.04.2022
Former [2022/35]EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
PT22.04.2022
Former [2022/34]EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
PT22.04.2022
Former [2022/33]FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
Former [2022/30]FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
Former [2022/25]FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
Former [2022/24]FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
Former [2022/22]FI22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
Former [2022/21]RS22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
Former [2022/19]BG22.03.2022
Documents cited:Search[A]CA2509372  (FUKS VLADIMIR [CA]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *;
 [XI]WO2009155685  (AMIRI AHMAD [CA]) [X] 1,6,8 * the whole document * [I] 9,10;
 [A]CN201580385U  (TAIYUAN YINLIDA MACHINERY ACCESSORIES FACTORY) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN204222875U  (XUZHOU SUMEI MINE EQUIPMENT MANUFACTURE CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.