Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3412170

EP3412170 - CLOSURE MECHANISM PROTECTOR FOR A LUGGAGE CASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsonite IP Holdings S.ÀR.L.
13-15 Avenue de la Liberté
1931 Luxembourg / LU
[2018/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Kharka, Dhirendra
29C, Tower3, Banyan Garden
863 Lai Chi Kok Road
Kowloon, Hong Kong / CN
 [2018/50]
Representative(s)Lloyd, Robin , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2018/50]
Application number, filing date17175186.009.06.2017
[2018/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3412170
Date:12.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:A45C5/03, A45C13/02, // A45C13/03
[2018/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERSCHLUSSMECHANISMUSSCHUTZ FÜR EINE KOFFERSCHALE[2018/50]
English:CLOSURE MECHANISM PROTECTOR FOR A LUGGAGE CASE[2018/50]
French:MÉCANISME DE FERMETURE PROTECTEUR POUR UNE VALISE[2018/50]
Examination procedure13.06.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/46]
27.06.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2019/46]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US2015296940  (TSENG TZU-WEI [HK] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * figure - *;
 [A]US2010282556  (TSENG TZU-WEI [TW] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * figure - *;
 [A]US2007241145  (WILLIAMS MATTHEW [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure - *;
 [A]WO0121026  (500 GROUP INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 8 *
 [XI]  - CampSaver, "Pacsafe Toursafe", You Tube, (20160511), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=iDN_mpM1UeA, (20170928), XP054977767 [X] 1-8,12-15 * the whole document * [I] 9-11
by applicantEP1196058
 US6135253
 US7735615
 US8429777
 US8459422
 US9480315
 US2004154889
 US2014083580