Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3251874

EP3251874 - TIRE, AND TIRE MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.10.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.06.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2017/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Fudemoto, Hiroyuki
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo, 104-8340 / JP
02 / Harada, Takashi
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo, 104-8340 / JP
03 / Kouno, Yoshihide
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo, 104-8340 / JP
04 / Kon, Seiji
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo, 104-8340 / JP
05 / Hasegawa, Keiichi
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo, 104-8340 / JP
06 / Iizuka, Munenori
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo, 104-8340 / JP
07 / Yako, Takayuki
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo, 104-8340 / JP
08 / Machida, Kunio
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo, 104-8340 / JP
 [2018/06]
Former [2017/49]01 / Fudemoto, Hiroyuki
c/o Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo, 104-8340 / JP
02 / Harada, Takashi
c/o Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo, 104-8340 / JP
03 / Kouno, Yoshihide
c/o Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo, 104-8340 / JP
04 / Kon, Seiji
c/o Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo, 104-8340 / JP
05 / Hasegawa, Keiichi
c/o Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo, 104-8340 / JP
06 / Iizuka, Munenori
c/o Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo, 104-8340 / JP
07 / Yako, Takayuki
c/o Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo, 104-8340 / JP
08 / Machida, Kunio
c/o Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo, 104-8340 / JP
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/49]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date17176152.125.08.2011
[2017/49]
Priority number, dateJP2010018890325.08.2010         Original published format: JP 2010188903
JP2010018891525.08.2010         Original published format: JP 2010188915
JP2010018890025.08.2010         Original published format: JP 2010188900
JP2010018890125.08.2010         Original published format: JP 2010188901
JP2010018892325.08.2010         Original published format: JP 2010188923
JP2010018890225.08.2010         Original published format: JP 2010188902
JP2010018892225.08.2010         Original published format: JP 2010188922
JP2010018891825.08.2010         Original published format: JP 2010188918
JP2010018891925.08.2010         Original published format: JP 2010188919
JP2010020373210.09.2010         Original published format: JP 2010203732
JP2010020367610.09.2010         Original published format: JP 2010203676
JP2010025804018.11.2010         Original published format: JP 2010258040
JP2010025804118.11.2010         Original published format: JP 2010258041
[2017/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3251874
Date:06.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3251874
Date:20.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60C5/01, B60C9/22
[2017/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/28]
Former [2017/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:REIFEN UND REIFENHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN[2017/49]
English:TIRE, AND TIRE MANUFACTURING METHOD[2017/49]
French:PNEU ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PNEUS[2017/49]
Examination procedure14.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/28]
04.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2019Fee for grant paid
07.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11820010.4  / EP2610072
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
28.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL20.02.2019
AT20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
PL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
SM20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
[2020/03]
Former [2019/52]AL20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
PL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
SM20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/51]AL20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
SM20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/49]AL20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/48]DK20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/47]ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
NO20.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
NO20.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[L]EP2399759  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [L] 1-5 * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] , [0008] , [0009] , [0011] , [0012] , [0014] , [0015] , [0019] , [0023] , [0055] , [0057] , [0065] , [0120] *;
 [L]EP2468489  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [L] 1-5 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0017] , [0018] , [0032] , [0033] , [0034] , [0035]; figure 1 *
by applicantJP2003104008
 JPH03143701
 JP2004346273
 JPH05331256
 JPH1148264
 JPH1129658
 JP2003238744