Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3257848

EP3257848 - COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR MODULATING EGFR ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  29.06.2018
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 01.08.2018  [2018/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2017/51]
Inventor(s)01 / LELAIS, Gerald
Novartis Institute for Functional Genomics, Inc
dba Genomics Inst. of the Novartis Research
Foundation (GNF)
10675 John Jay Hopkins Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / EPPLE, Robert
Novartis Institute for Functional Genomics, Inc
dba Genomics Inst. of the Novartis Research
Foundation (GNF)
10675 John Jay Hopkins Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / MARSILJE III, Thomas H.
Novartis Institute for Functional Genomics, Inc
dba Genomics Inst. of the Novartis Research
Foundation (GNF)
10675 John Jay Hopkins Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
04 / MICHELLYS, Pierre-Yves
Novartis Institute for Functional Genomics, Inc
dba Genomics Inst. of the Novartis Research
Foundation (GNF)
10675 John Jay Hopkins Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
05 / MCNEILL, Matthew H.
Novartis Institute for Functional Genomics, Inc
dba Genomics Inst. of the Novartis Research
Foundation (GNF)
10675 John Jay Hopkins Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
06 / LONG, Yun
Novartis Institute for Functional Genomics, Inc
dba Genomics Inst. of the Novartis Research
Foundation (GNF)
10675 John Jay Hopkins Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
07 / LU, Wenshuo
Novartis Institute for Functional Genomics, Inc
dba Genomics Inst. of the Novartis Research
Foundation (GNF)
10675 John Jay Hopkins Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
08 / CHEN, Bei
Novartis Institute for Functional Genomics, Inc
dba Genomics Inst. of the Novartis Research
Foundation (GNF)
10675 John Jay Hopkins Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
09 / BURSULAYA, Badry
Novartis Institute for Functional Genomics, Inc
dba Genomics Inst. of the Novartis Research
Foundation (GNF)
10675 John Jay Hopkins Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
10 / JIANG, Songchun
Novartis Institute for Functional Genomics, Inc
dba Genomics Inst. of the Novartis Research
Foundation (GNF)
10675 John Jay Hopkins Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2017/51]
Representative(s)von Sprecher, Georg
Novartis Pharma AG
Patent Department
4002 Basel / CH
[2017/51]
Application number, filing date17176482.205.06.2013
[2017/51]
Priority number, dateIN2012DEL174106.06.2012         Original published format: IN 1741DE2012
US201361770752P28.02.2013         Original published format: US 201361770752 P
[2017/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3257848
Date:20.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07D401/14, C07D413/14, C07D403/04, C07D403/14, C07D413/04, C07D471/04, C07D513/04, A61K31/4439, C07D405/14, A61K45/06, A61K31/4184, A61K31/454, A61K31/4545, A61K31/55, A61K31/551, A61K31/553, C07D401/04, C07D417/14
[2017/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR MODULATION DER EGFR-AKTIVITÄT[2017/51]
English:COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR MODULATING EGFR ACTIVITY[2017/51]
French:COMPOSÉS ET COMPOSITIONS DE MODULATION DE L'ACTIVITÉ EGFR[2017/51]
Examination procedure11.06.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/31]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13729219.9  / EP2773635
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
16.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2004014905  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [US]) [A] 1-24 * page 1, line 21; page 141, line 10;;; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO03041708  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [US]) [A] 1-24 * page 1, line 25; page 27, line 24;;; claim 1 *
by applicantWO2004078163
 US6602677
 EP0039051
 US5484596
 WO2009143389
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, Mack Printing Company, (19900000), pages 1289 - 1329
    - CROUCH et al., J. Immunol. Meth, (19930000), vol. 160, pages 81 - 88
    - CREE et al., AntiCancer Drugs, (19950000), vol. 6, pages 398 - 404
    - BUNDGAARD, J. Med. Chem., (19890000), page 2503
    - HOUBEN-WEYL, Science of Synthesis, Georg Thieme Verlag, vol. 1-48
    - SCHIRRMACHER et al., J. Cancer Res. Clin. Oncol., (19950000), vol. 121, page 487