Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3419165

EP3419165 - ANALOGUE TO DIGITAL CONVERSION APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
05.07.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
05.07.2019Change - designated statespublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2018/52]
Inventor(s)01 / SARIARSLAN, Muhammet Kürsat
C/O Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2018/52]
Representative(s)Flint, Adam
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2018/52]
Application number, filing date17177630.523.06.2017
[2018/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3419165
Date:26.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H03H7/01, H03M1/12
[2018/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/32]
Former [2018/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANALOG-DIGITAL-WANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN[2018/52]
English:ANALOGUE TO DIGITAL CONVERSION APPARATUS AND METHOD[2018/52]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONVERSION ANALOGIQUE-NUMÉRIQUE[2018/52]
Examination procedure26.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/32]
26.06.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[I]  - Hemant Ashok Deshmukh, "Low Power Input and Reference Driver Circuit for ADS8318 and ADS8319", (20090601), pages 1 - 14, URL: http://www.ti.com/lit/an/sboa118/sboa118.pdf, (20171127), XP055429007 [I] 1-15 * Section 2;; figures 4-6 *
 [I]  - Luis Chioye, "RTD Ratiometric Measurements and Filtering Using the ADS1148 and ADS1248 Family of Devices", (20130301), pages 1 - 14, URL: http://www.ti.com/lit/an/sbaa201/sbaa201.pdf?DCMP=hpa_contriubted_article&HQS=sbaa201-ca, (20171127), XP055429005 [I] 1-15 * Section 2; Section 3;; figures 2,3,6,8,10 *
 [I]  - Reza Moghimi, "Technical Article Seven Steps to Successful Analog-to-Digital Signal Conversion (Noise Calculation for Proper Signal Conditioning)", (20110501), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://www.analog.com/media/en/technical-documentation/technical-articles/MS-2022.pdf, (20171127), XP055429003 [I] 1-15 * Step 1; Step 2; Step 3; Step 4; Step 5; Step 6;;; figures 1,3 *
 [I]  - RON MANCINI, "Filter your voltage reference for low-noise performance", EDN, (20040925), pages 32 - 32, XP055429333 [I] 1-15 * Section 2; Section 4;; figures 6,7 *
 [A]  - BONNIE C BAKER, "Designing an anti-aliasing filter for ADCs in the frequency domain Introduction", ANALOG APPLICATIONS JOURNAL, (20150601), pages 1 - 5, XP055429337 [A] 1-15 * Section Introduction; Section Filter corner frequency (fc);; figures 1,2,5 *
 [A]  - Texas Instruments, "AN-1393 Using High Speed Differential Amplifiers to Drive Analog-to-Digital Converters", (20130401), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://www.ti.com/lit/an/snoa461a/snoa461a.pdf, (20171127), XP055429006 [A] 1-15 * page 32; figures 1,2 *