Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3422190

EP3422190 - A METHOD OF TESTING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  30.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
05.07.2019Amendment by applicant 
05.07.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
05.07.2019Change - designated statespublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2019/01]
Inventor(s)01 / METIN, Duygu
C/O Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
02 / GEBIZLI, Ceren Sahin
C/O Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2019/01]
Representative(s)Flint, Adam
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2019/01]
Application number, filing date17178480.428.06.2017
[2019/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3422190
Date:02.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/36
[2019/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/32]
Former [2019/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM TESTEN EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG[2019/01]
English:A METHOD OF TESTING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE[2019/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ESSAI D'UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE[2019/01]
Examination procedure01.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2019Examination requested  [2019/32]
01.07.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2017083432  (DHULIPALA KRISHNA R [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0004] , [0017] , [0020] - [0022] - [0029] - [0033] - [0035] - [0037] - [0047] , [0058]; figures 1-2; claims 1-6 * [I] 2-5;
 [A]US2016026557  (HWANG HUBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0082] *;
 [A]US2013159774  (BUDNIK CHRISTOF [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0006] - [0012] - [0033] - [0050]; figures 2,3a,3b *
 [XI]  - GEBIZLI CEREN SAHIN ET AL, "Improving Models for Model-Based Testing Based on Exploratory Testing", 2014 IEEE 38TH INTERNATIONAL COMPUTER SOFTWARE AND APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE WORKSHOPS, IEEE, (20140721), doi:10.1109/COMPSACW.2014.110, pages 656 - 661, XP032646823 [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [000I] , [ III] , [0 IV] - [IV.A] - [00 V] * [I] 2-5

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/COMPSACW.2014.110
 [A]  - ITKONEN J ET AL, "Exploratory testing: a multiple case study", EMPIRICAL SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, 2005. 2005 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON NOV. 17, 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20051117), doi:10.1109/ISESE.2005.1541817, ISBN 978-0-7803-9507-7, pages 82 - 91, XP010855050 [A] 1-5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISESE.2005.1541817