Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3422196

EP3422196 - PORT TERMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  30.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
05.07.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
05.07.2019Change - designated statespublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2019/01]
Inventor(s)01 / ER, Alper Sait
c/o Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
02 / YILDIZ, Kadir
c/o Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2019/01]
Representative(s)Flint, Adam
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2019/01]
Application number, filing date17178796.329.06.2017
[2019/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3422196
Date:02.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/40
[2019/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/32]
Former [2019/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PORT-ABSCHLUSS[2019/01]
English:PORT TERMINATION[2019/01]
French:CONNEXION DE PORT[2019/01]
Examination procedure01.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2019Examination requested  [2019/32]
01.07.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2014379951  (TAKI KINJI [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0070] * * figure 5 *;
 [Y]US2012141132  (WALKER RICHARD C [US]) [Y] 1-13 * figures 1,3 * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0042] *;
 [A]WO2014140660  (SILICON IMAGE INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0061] *;
 [A]WO2010051281  (SILICON IMAGE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 1,3,4 *