Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3425907

EP3425907 - DISPLAY DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RENDERING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
12.07.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
12.07.2019Change - designated statespublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2019/02]
Inventor(s)01 / SARIARSLAN, Muhammet Kürsat
C/O Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2019/02]
Representative(s)Flint, Adam
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2019/02]
Application number, filing date17179371.403.07.2017
[2019/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3425907
Date:09.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04N13/393
[2019/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/33]
Former [2019/02]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERGABE EINES DREIDIMENSIONALEN BILDES[2019/02]
English:DISPLAY DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RENDERING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGE[2019/02]
French:AFFICHEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE RENDU D'UNE IMAGE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE[2019/02]
Examination procedure08.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.07.2019Examination requested  [2019/33]
08.07.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US5793918  (HOGAN RICHARD J [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 3, line 56 - column 6, line 49; figures 1-9 *;
 [X]US6462840  (KRAVTSOV GRIGORY [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 6, line 28 - column 8, line 29; figures 3-8, 15 *;
 [A]GB2506696  (LLEDO OSCAR MOYA [GB]) [A] 1-15 * page 3 - page 6; figures 3-5 *;
 [A]US8552883  (SU GEORGE C [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 65 - column 3, line 30; figures 1-5 *