Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3425447

EP3425447 - METHOD, DEVICE AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR VIRTUAL ADAPTING OF A SPECTACLE FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Zeiss Vision International GmbH
Turnstrasse 27
73430 Aalen / DE
[2019/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Schwarz, Oliver
Heidstrasse 9
73492 Rainau / DE
02 / Breuninger, Tobias
Böllstrasse 4
89542 Herbrechtingen / DE
 [2019/02]
Representative(s)Sticht, Andreas
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[2019/02]
Application number, filing date17180008.906.07.2017
[2019/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3425447
Date:09.01.2019
Language:DE
[2019/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3425447
Date:11.09.2019
Language:DE
[2019/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:G02C13/00, G06Q30/06, G06T19/20, G06T17/00
[2019/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/02]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM ZUM VIRTUELLEN ANPASSEN EINER BRILLENFASSUNG[2019/02]
English:METHOD, DEVICE AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR VIRTUAL ADAPTING OF A SPECTACLE FRAME[2019/02]
French:PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR DESTINÉS À L'ADAPTATION VIRTUELLE D'UNE MONTURE DE LUNETTES[2019/02]
Examination procedure11.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.07.2018Examination requested  [2019/02]
11.07.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2019Fee for grant paid
24.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2016164859  (BESPOKE INC [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6,13,14 * figure 2A * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0023] , [0028] , [0030] , [0057] , [0058] , [0070] , [0088] , [0089] , [0094] , [0101] * [I] 2,5,7-12;
 [A]US2015243015  (GUERIN CLAUDE [FR]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-9 *;
 [A]US5576778  (FUJIE RYUTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 14 *;
 [AD]US2016327811  (HADDADI AHMED [FR], et al) [AD] 1-14 * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0057] *
ExaminationWO2013177456
 WO0188654
by applicantUS2003123026
 US2002015530
 US9286715
 US2005162419
 US2015055085
 DE10216824
 US2015277155
 US2013088490
 US2015293382
 US2016327811
    - RAU J-Y; YEH P-C, "A Semi-Automatic Image-Based Close Range 3D Modeling Pipeline Using a Multi-Camera Configuration", Sensors, (20120000), vol. 12, no. 8, pages 11271 - 11293
    - M. NIEßNER; M. ZOLLHÖFER; S. IZADI; M. STAMMINGER, "Real-time 3D reconstruction at scale using voxel hashing", ACM Trans. Graph., (20131100), vol. 32, page 6
    - J. EBER, Anatomische Brillenanpassung, Verlag Optische Fachveröffentlichung GmbH, page 24
    - H. HIRSCHMÜLLER, "Stereo Processing by Semiglobal Matching and Mutual Information", IEEE Transactions on Pattern Analysis and Machine Intelligence, (20080200), vol. 30, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2007.1166, pages 328 - 341, XP011195575

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2007.1166
    - JOHANNES EBER, Anatomische Brillenanpassung, Verlag Optische Fachveröffentlichung GmbH, (19870000), page 17ff
    - J. BOOTH; A. ROUSSOS; S. ZAFEIRIOU; A. PONNIAH; D. DUNAWAY, "A 3D Morphable Model learntfrom 10,000 faces", 2016 IEEE Conference on Computer Vision and Patent Recognition (CVPR, (20160000), pages 5543 - 5552
    - bivariate polynomial, (20170608), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Polynomial#Definition
    - JOHANNES EBER, Anatomische Brillenanpassung, Verlag Optische Fachveröffentlichung GmbH, (19870000), page 26
 EP20170173929
 EP20170153556
 EP20170153558
 EP20170153559