Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3272288

EP3272288 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CT DATA RECONSTRUCTION BASED ON MOTION COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.09.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.07.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SM
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vatech Co. Ltd.
13 Samseong 1-ro 2-gil
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR
For all designated states
Vatech Ewoo Holdings Co., Ltd.
14, Samsung 1-ro 1-gil
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR
For all designated states
Korea Advanced Institute of Science and Technology
291 Daehak-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34141 / KR
[2018/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Ye, Jong chul
291 Daehak-ro
Yuseong-gu
34141 Daejeon / KR
02 / Gu, Ja wook
291 Daehak-ro
Yuseong-gu
34141 Daejeon / KR
03 / Kim, Tae Woo
13, Samsung 1-ro
2-gil
Hwaseong-si
445-170 Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / Choi, Sung II
13, Samsung 1-ro
2-gil
Hwaseong-si
445-170 Gyeonggi-do / KR
05 / Bae, Woong
13, Samsung 1-ro
2-gil
Hwaseong-si
445-170 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2018/04]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2018/04]
Application number, filing date17180020.406.07.2017
[2018/04]
Priority number, dateKR2016009375922.07.2016         Original published format: KR 20160093759
KR2016017263516.12.2016         Original published format: KR 20160172635
[2018/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3272288
Date:24.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3272288
Date:20.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B6/00, G06T11/00, A61B6/03, A61B6/14, G06T7/285
[2018/38]
Former International [2018/04]A61B6/00, G06T11/00, A61B6/03, A61B6/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/35]
Former [2018/04]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR CTA-DATENREKONSTRUKTION BASIEREND AUF BEWEGUNGSAUSGLEICH[2018/04]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CT DATA RECONSTRUCTION BASED ON MOTION COMPENSATION[2018/04]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE RECONSTRUCTION DE DONNÉES DE TOMODENSITOMÉTRIE BASÉE SUR LA COMPENSATION DE MOUVEMENT[2018/04]
Examination procedure06.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/35]
25.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2019Fee for grant paid
04.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL20.03.2019
CZ20.03.2019
EE20.03.2019
ES20.03.2019
FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
IT20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RO20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
SK20.03.2019
SM20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
PT20.07.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/49]AL20.03.2019
CZ20.03.2019
EE20.03.2019
ES20.03.2019
FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
IT20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RO20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
SK20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
PT20.07.2019
Former [2019/48]ES20.03.2019
FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
IT20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
PT20.07.2019
Former [2019/47]ES20.03.2019
FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
IT20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
IT20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
NO20.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
NO20.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2015356756  (OKAMOTO SHUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-26 * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0191] * [Y] 2-7;
 [Y]US2007116171  (HSIEH JIANG [US], et al) [Y] 2-7 * abstract * * figures 1-10 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0078] *;
 [A]US2014334710  (FOURAS ANDREAS [AU], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * figures 1-11 * * paragraph [0139] - paragraph [0241] *