Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3273317

EP3273317 - AUTONOMOUS SYSTEM FOR TAKING MOVING IMAGES, COMPRISING A DRONE AND A GROUND STATION, AND ASSOCIATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.04.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Parrot Drones
174-178 quai de Jemmapes
75010 Paris / FR
[2018/04]
Inventor(s)01 / LEURENT, Edouard
26, rue tournefort
75005 Paris / FR
 [2018/04]
Representative(s)Dupuis-Latour, Dominique , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg
SO Square Opéra
5, rue Boudreau
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2018/04]Dupuis-Latour, Dominique , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg
10, boulevard Haussmann
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date17180644.111.07.2017
[2018/04]
Priority number, dateFR2016005701622.07.2016         Original published format: FR 1657016
[2018/04]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3273317
Date:24.01.2018
Language:FR
[2018/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G05D1/00, A63H27/00
[2018/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/16]
Former [2018/04]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUTONOMES AUFNAHMESYSTEM VON ANIMIERTEN BILDERN, DAS EINE DROHNE UND EINE BODENSTATION UMFASST, UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN[2018/04]
English:AUTONOMOUS SYSTEM FOR TAKING MOVING IMAGES, COMPRISING A DRONE AND A GROUND STATION, AND ASSOCIATED METHOD[2018/04]
French:SYSTÈME AUTONOME DE PRISE DE VUES ANIMÉES COMPRENANT UN DRONE ET UNE STATION AU SOL, ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ[2018/04]
Examination procedure11.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/16]
18.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/31]
04.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Documents cited:Search[XYI]FR3031402  (SQUADRONE SYSTEM [FR]) [X] 1-3,6,10,11 * Page 1 lignes 1-2, page 2 lignes 9-16, 19-25, page 3 lignes 5-37, page 4 lignes 17-33, Figures 1-5 * [Y] 5,9 [I] 4,7,8;
 [Y]US9164506  (ZANG BO [CN]) [Y] 5,9 * Colonne 8 lignes 62-67, colonne 9 lignes 5-8, colonne 15 lignes 26-34, colonne 47 lignes 6-9, colonne 51 lignes 34-37 *