Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3273149

EP3273149 - LIGHT MODULE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valeo Vision Belgique
Parc Industriel, 31
7822 Meslin l'Evêque / BE
[2018/04]
Inventor(s)01 / VALOIS, Christophe
VALEO VISION BELGIQUE
31, rue du Parc Industriel
7822 Meslin l'Éveque / BE
02 / DEPOORTER, Kurt
VALEO VISION BELGIQUE
31, rue du Parc Industriel
7822 Meslin l'Éveque / BE
03 / LUU, Frédéric
VALEO VISION BELGIQUE
31, rue du Parc Industriel
7822 Meslin l'Éveque / BE
 [2018/04]
Representative(s)Schaffner, Jean
Valeo Vision
34, rue Saint-André
93012 Bobigny / FR
[2018/04]
Application number, filing date17181044.312.07.2017
[2018/04]
Priority number, dateFR2016005683818.07.2016         Original published format: FR 1656838
[2018/04]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3273149
Date:24.01.2018
Language:FR
[2018/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F21S43/20, F21S43/237, F21S43/245, F21S43/50, F21S43/251, // F21S43/14, F21S43/241, F21S43/243
[2018/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/33]
Former [2018/04]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LEUCHTMODUL FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE[2018/04]
English:LIGHT MODULE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE[2018/04]
French:MODULE LUMINEUX POUR VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE[2018/04]
Examination procedure12.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/33]
24.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0306399  (NEIMAN SA [FR]) [X] 1-4,7,11,12,14 * column 4, line 6 - column 5, line 10 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 5,6,8-10;
 [XI]US2010195342  (LAMBERT CHAD D [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,7,11,12,14 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0037] * * figures 1,2 * [I] 5,6,8-10;
 [A]WO2013113728  (AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REAR LAMPS FRANCE S A S [FR]) [A] 1-14 * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 3 * * figures 2,4 *;
 [A]FR3008774  (RENAULT SA [FR]) [A] 1-14 * page 5, line 19 - page 7, line 19 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2014078764  (AIZAWA DAISUKE [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0029] * * figure 3 *