Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3269915

EP3269915 - DOOR LEAF, DOOR AND A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE DOOR LEAF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.09.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.07.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 28.08.2019 [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCHÜCO International KG
Karolinenstrasse 1 - 15
33609 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/03]
Inventor(s)01 / PEIN, Sören
Friedrichsdorfer Str. 26 b
16845 Großderschau / DE
02 / BRANDES, Matthias
Zum Schelland 34
32602 Vlotho / DE
03 / LUTZENBERGER, Tobias
Turnerstr. 45
33602 Bielefeld / DE
04 / SCHILLER, Mathias
Industriestr. 25
33790 Halle / DE
 [2018/03]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/03]
Application number, filing date17181255.513.07.2017
[2018/03]
Priority number, dateDE20161011302514.07.2016         Original published format: DE102016113025
[2018/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3269915
Date:17.01.2018
Language:DE
[2018/03]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3269915
Date:28.08.2019
Language:DE
[2019/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:E06B3/72, E06B3/82, E06B3/70
[2018/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/34]
Former [2018/03]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:TÜRFLÜGEL, TÜR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES TÜRFLÜGELS[2018/03]
English:DOOR LEAF, DOOR AND A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE DOOR LEAF[2018/03]
French:VANTAIL, PORTE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE VANTAIL[2018/03]
Examination procedure13.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/34]
17.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2019Fee for grant paid
12.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE202007002705U  (WILKEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,16,19 * figure 2 * [I] 2-5,17,18;
 [XI]DE19706618  (GLAS & SPIEGEL SCHULZ KIEL GMB [DE]) [X] 1,19 * figure 3 * [I] 2-5,10-15;
 [I]BE1010213  (KARMANN MARKETING BVBA [BE]) [I] 1-9,19 * figure 4 *
by applicantEP1568842
 DE20314017U
 DE202014101376U
 EP2942466