Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3273651

EP3273651 - DISTRIBUTED CONSTRAINED TREE FORMATION FOR DETERMINISTIC MULTICAST [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.07.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.11.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cisco Technology, Inc.
170 W. Tasman Drive
San Jose, CA 95134-1706 / US
[2018/04]
Inventor(s)01 / THUBERT, Pascal
La Pinatelo Villa 13
123 chemin des Bas Campons
06480 La Colle Sur Loop / FR
02 / WIJNANDS, Ijsbrand
Bogaardenstraat 58
3000 Leuven / BE
03 / WETTERWALD, Patrick
1249 Chemin des Plaines
06370 Mouans Sartoux / FR
04 / LEVY-ABEGNOLI, Eric
1282 Chemin de PeyreBelle
06560 Valbone / FR
05 / VASSEUR, Jean-Philippe
620 Clipper Ship Court
Anchorage, AK 99515 / US
 [2018/04]
Representative(s)Clark, Jane Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2018/04]
Application number, filing date17181349.614.07.2017
[2018/04]
Priority number, dateUS20161521600721.07.2016         Original published format: US201615216007
[2018/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3273651
Date:24.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/727, H04L12/761, H04L12/753, H04L12/725
[2018/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/34]
Former [2018/04]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BILDUNG VERTEILTER EINGESCHRÄNKTER BÄUME FÜR DETERMINISTISCHES MULTICAST[2018/04]
English:DISTRIBUTED CONSTRAINED TREE FORMATION FOR DETERMINISTIC MULTICAST[2018/04]
French:LA FORMATION D'ARBORESCENCES CONTRAINTES RÉPARTI POUR MULTIDIFFUSION DÉTERMINISTE[2018/04]
Examination procedure14.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/34]
09.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - ELIZABETH M ROYER ET AL, "Multicast operation of the ad-hoc on-demand distance vector routing protocol", MOBICOM '99. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 5TH ANNUAL ACM/IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MOBILE COMPUTING AND NETWORKING. SEATTLE, WA, AUG. 15 - 20, 1999; [ANNUAL ACM/IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MOBILE COMPUTING AND NETWORKING], NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US, (19990815), doi:10.1145/313451.313538, ISBN 978-1-58113-142-0, pages 207 - 218, XP058084956 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * sections 2-4, 6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/313451.313538
 [Y]  - CHEN ET AL, "SoMR: A scalable distributed QoS multicast routing protocol", JOURNAL OF PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071112), vol. 68, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JPDC.2007.10.004, ISSN 0743-7315, pages 137 - 149, XP022410958 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * sections 3, 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpdc.2007.10.004
 [A]  - CHARLES E PERKINS NOKIA RESEARCH CENTER ELIZABETH M BELDING-ROYER UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ET AL, "Quality of Service for Ad hoc On-Demand Distance Vector Routing; draft-perkins-manet-aodvqos-01.txt", QUALITY OF SERVICE FOR AD HOC ON-DEMAND DISTANCE VECTOR ROUTING; DRAFT-PERKINS-MANET-AODVQOS-01.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20031014), no. 1, XP015033849 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * pages 1-9 *
 [A]  - Vida Lashakari B.O. ET AL, "QoS-aware Multicast Ad hoc On-Demand Distance Vector Routing", (20070702), URL: http://www.iaeng.org/publication/WCE2007/WCE2007_pp1506-1511.pdf, (20171017), XP055416337 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * sections I-III *