Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3273651


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.11.2019 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
31.07.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.05.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.03.2019 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.11.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.11.2018 First examination report
20.07.2018 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
20.07.2018 Request for examination filed published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
20.07.2018 Change - designated states published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
13.07.2018 Amendment by applicant
28.12.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.01.2018  [2018/04]
14.07.2017 Change - representative