EP3272330 - COMPOSITION AND COSMETIC METHOD FOR REDUCING CELLULITE BLEMISHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Italfarmacia S.r.l. Via di Tor Sapienza, 7 00155 Roma / IT | [2018/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cavallo, Giovanni Via delle Tartane, 45 I-00122 Ostia (RM) / IT | 02 /
Marchetti, Mario Via L. Spallanzani, 32 I-00161 Rome / IT | 03 /
Marchetti, Marco Via Adriano I, 172 I-00167 Rome / IT | 04 /
Marchetti, Massimiliano Via Adriano I, 172 I-00167 Roma / IT | 05 /
Amuso, Domenico Via Puccini, 64 I-41100 Modena / IT | 06 /
Cavallo, Francesca Via delle Tartane, 45 I-00122 Ostia (RM) / IT | 07 /
De Lorenzo, Antonino Facoltà di Medicina e Chirurgia Tor F Sud, 5° Piano Via Montpellier, 1 I-00133 Roma / IT | 08 /
Di Renzo, Laura Facoltà di Medicina e Chirurgia Tor F Sud, 5° Piano Via Montpellier, 1 I-00133 Roma / IT | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Sarpi, Maurizio, et al Studio Ferrario S.r.l. Via Collina, 36 00187 Roma / IT | [2018/04] | Application number, filing date | 17181452.8 | 14.07.2017 | [2018/04] | Priority number, date | IT20160075108 | 18.07.2016 Original published format: IT201600075108 | [2018/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3272330 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3272330 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/67, A61Q19/06 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
A61K8/676 (EP);
A61Q19/06 (EP);
A61K2800/5922 (EP);
A61K2800/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] |
Former [2018/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND KOSMETISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR REDUKTION VON SCHÖNHEITSFEHLERN INFOLGE VON ZELLULITIS | [2018/04] | English: | COMPOSITION AND COSMETIC METHOD FOR REDUCING CELLULITE BLEMISHES | [2018/04] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PROCÉDÉ COSMÉTIQUE POUR DIMINUER LES IMPERFECTIONS DE LA CELLULITE | [2018/04] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 05.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.07.2017 | AL | 18.08.2021 | AT | 18.08.2021 | CY | 18.08.2021 | CZ | 18.08.2021 | DK | 18.08.2021 | EE | 18.08.2021 | ES | 18.08.2021 | FI | 18.08.2021 | HR | 18.08.2021 | LT | 18.08.2021 | LV | 18.08.2021 | MC | 18.08.2021 | NL | 18.08.2021 | PL | 18.08.2021 | RO | 18.08.2021 | RS | 18.08.2021 | SE | 18.08.2021 | SI | 18.08.2021 | SK | 18.08.2021 | SM | 18.08.2021 | BG | 18.11.2021 | NO | 18.11.2021 | IS | 18.12.2021 | PT | 20.12.2021 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 14.07.2017 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]WO9528084 (METAGENICS INC [US]) [X] 11 * claims 10-12 * * claim 20 * * claim 29 * [A] 12 [Y] 1-11,13-16 [I] 1-5; | [IA]EP0717983 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [I] 1-11,13-16 * example 6 * * example 12 * * claim 3 * [A] 12; | [XAYI]US5895652 (GIAMPAPA VINCENT C [US]) [X] 11 * claim 1 * [A] 12 [Y] 1-11,13-16 [I] 1,3-5; | [YDA]WO0113865 (MURAD HOWARD [US]) [YD] 1-11,13-16 * page 35 - page 42 * [A] 12; | [YA]WO2011156803 (TRANSDEL PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-11,13-16 * page 7 - page 9 * * claim 5 * [A] 12; | [IA]US2013224280 (TOTH RITA [US]) [I] 1-11,13-16 * paragraph [0037] *[A] 12; | [XAY] - Mead Johnson Nutrition, "Original flavoured step 3 formulated milk powder", GNPD, MINTEL, (201605), Database accession no. 4007741, XP002770477 [X] 1,3-8,11,13-15 * Ingredients * [A] 12 [Y] 1-11,16 | [IA] - Apotheker Scheller, "Aroma Vita Energy Lemongras Anti-Cellulite Oil", GNPD, MINTEL, (200305), Database accession no. 206383, XP002770478 [I] 1-11,13-16 * Product description * * Ingredients * * Claims * [A] 12 | [IA] - Maria Galland, "Silhouette Body Sculpting Cream", GNPD, MINTEL, (200805), Database accession no. 911919, XP002770479 [I] 1-11,13-16 * Ingredients * * Claims * [A] 12 | by applicant | EP1207840 | - Journal of Chinese Medicine Research, (20090000), vol. 9, pages 325 - 329 |