Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3264240

EP3264240 - TOUCH SCREEN LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2020Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino CA 95014 / US
[2018/31]
Former [2018/01]For all designated states
Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014-2094 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HOTELLING, Steven Porter
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US
02 / CHEN, Wei
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US
03 / KRAH, Christoph Horst
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US
04 / ELIAS, John Greer
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US
05 / YAO, Wei Hsin
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US
06 / ZHONG, JOHN Z.
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US
07 / HODGE, Andrew Bert
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US
08 / LAND, Brian Richards
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US
09 / DEN BOER, Willem
9184 Lanning Lane
Brighton, MI, 48116 / US
 [2018/01]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2018/01]
Application number, filing date17182184.608.06.2007
[2018/01]
Priority number, dateUS20060804361P09.06.2006         Original published format: US 804361 P
US20070883979P08.01.2007         Original published format: US 883979 P
[2018/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3264240
Date:03.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/041, G06F3/044, // G02F1/1343, G02F1/1333
[2018/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/01]
TitleGerman:BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRM-FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGE[2018/01]
English:TOUCH SCREEN LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY[2018/01]
French:ÉCRAN D'AFFICHAGE TACTILE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES[2018/01]
Examination procedure19.07.2017Examination requested  [2018/01]
19.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07812071.4  / EP2027526
EP11159165.7  / EP2330492
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
19.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
19.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
19.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
19.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
19.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
19.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
19.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
12.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[YDA]US2006097991  (HOTELLING STEVE [US], et al) [YD] 1-17 * paragraphs [0042] - [0043] * * paragraphs [0060] - [0069]; figures 6,7 * [A] 18-23;
 [YA]WO02103621  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [Y] 1-17 * page 7, line 12 - page 14, line 19 * * page 18, paragraph 23 - page 19, paragraph 16; figures 10a-10d * [A] 18-23;
 [A]US2001020987  (AHN YOUNG SOO [KR], et al) [A] 10-13 * paragraph [0016] *;
 [IA]EP1455264  (SHARP KK [JP]) [I] 22 * paragraphs [0044] - [0047]; figure 6 * [A] 23;
 [A]US2004217945  (MIYAMOTO SABURO [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0085] - [0142]; figures 1-11 *;
 [A]EP0770971  (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6323846
    - J. HECTOR; P. BUCHSCHACHER, "Low Power Driving Options for an AMLCD Mobile Display Chipset", SID 02 Digest, pages 695 - 697
 US20090367749
 US20040840862
 US20060381313
 US20060367749
 US20070650049
 US20070946607