Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3321804

EP3321804 - NETWORK AWARE DYNAMIC ORCHESTRATION METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MULTICAST SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cisco Technology, Inc.
170 W. Tasman Drive
San Jose, CA 95134-1706 / US
[2018/20]
Inventor(s)01 / MANICKAM, Arul Murugan
2539 Countrybrook
San Jose, CA 95132 / US
02 / CHINNASAMY, Ramesh Kumar
516 Bayview Park Dr
Milipitas, CA 95035 / US
03 / SRIVASTAVA, Aditi
3200 Zanker Road
Unit 1147
San Jose, CA 95134 / US
 [2018/20]
Representative(s)Clark, Jane Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2018/20]
Application number, filing date17183115.925.07.2017
[2018/20]
Priority number, dateUS20161534807810.11.2016         Original published format: US201615348078
[2018/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3321804
Date:16.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/48, G06F9/50
[2018/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/50]
Former [2018/20]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NETZWERKBEWUSSTES DYNAMISCHES INSTRUMENTATIONSVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR MULTICAST-DIENSTE[2018/20]
English:NETWORK AWARE DYNAMIC ORCHESTRATION METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MULTICAST SERVICES[2018/20]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ORCHESTRATION DYNAMIQUE SENSIBLE AU RÉSEAU ET SYSTÈME POUR SERVICES DE MULTIDIFFUSION[2018/20]
Examination procedure30.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.10.2018Examination requested  [2018/50]
30.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[I]US2011225277  (FREIMUTH DOUGLAS M [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0084] *;
 [IA]US2008155537  (DINDA PETER [US] ET AL) [I] 1-5,7-10,12-15 * abstract * * figure 15 * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0154] * [A] 6,11;
 [I]  - XIAOQIAO MENG ET AL, "Improving the Scalability of Data Center Networks with Traffic-aware Virtual Machine Placement", INFOCOM, 2010 PROCEEDINGS IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100314), ISBN 978-1-4244-5836-3, pages 1 - 9, XP031674817 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *