Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3435366

EP3435366 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING A BACKLIGHT UNIT, A BACKLIGHT UNIT AND A DISPLAY DEVICE AND CAMERA SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.08.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  30.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
02.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
02.08.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - designated statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2019/05]
Inventor(s)01 / YILDIZ, Kadir
C/O Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
02 / ER, Alper Sait
C/O Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2019/05]
Representative(s)Flint, Adam
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2019/05]
Application number, filing date17183145.625.07.2017
[2019/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3435366
Date:30.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/34
[2019/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/36]
Former [2019/05]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER RÜCKBELEUCHTUNGSEINHEIT, RÜCKBELEUCHTUNGSEINHEIT UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND KAMERASYSTEM[2019/05]
English:METHOD OF CONTROLLING A BACKLIGHT UNIT, A BACKLIGHT UNIT AND A DISPLAY DEVICE AND CAMERA SYSTEM[2019/05]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UNE UNITÉ DE RÉTROÉCLAIRAGE, UNITÉ DE RÉTROÉCLAIRAGE ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET SYSTÈME DE CAMÉRA[2019/05]
Examination procedure30.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.07.2019Examination requested  [2019/36]
30.07.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2011028335  (DOLBY LAB LICENSING CORP [US]; MESSMER NEIL W [CA]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2012147293  (DUNN WILLIAM [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1557817  (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *