Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3287641

EP3287641 - METHOD FOR REGULATING THE MASSFLOW OF A VENTILATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2018Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ebm-papst Mulfingen GmbH & Co. KG
Bachmühle 2
74673 Mulfingen / DE
[2018/09]
Inventor(s)01 / HAAF, Oliver
Georg-Adam-Reinhard-Str. 12
74635 Kupferzell / DE
02 / HELI, Thomas
Michelbacher Str. 46
74595 Langenburg / DE
03 / GEBERT, Daniel
Am Rain 2
74613 Öhringen / DE
 [2018/09]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/09]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date17183804.821.08.2017
[2018/09]
Priority number, dateDE20161011561723.08.2016         Original published format: DE102016115617
[2018/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3287641
Date:28.02.2018
Language:DE
[2018/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:F04D27/00, // F24F110/30, G01F1/06, G01F1/10
[2018/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/29]
Former [2018/09]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VOLUMENSTROMREGELUNG EINES VENTILATORS[2018/09]
English:METHOD FOR REGULATING THE MASSFLOW OF A VENTILATOR[2018/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION DE DÉBIT D'UN VENTILATEUR[2018/09]
Examination procedure28.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/29]
Documents cited:Search[I]EP1197244  (MICRONEL AG [CH]) [I] 1-8 * paragraphs [0004] , [00 5] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014] * * figures 1, 2 *;
 [I]WO9610733  (FANCOM BV [NL], et al) [I] 1-8 * figure 2 * * page 2, lines 10-15 * * page 3, lines 1-11 *;
 [A]WO2013052517  (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] * * figures 1, 4 *;
 [A]EP1850013  (EBM PAPST ST GEORGEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0041] - [0043] *;
 [A]GB2049925  (MARTINDALE PROTECTION LTD) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 * * page 1, lines 1-18 *