Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3284936

EP3284936 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR A LAMBDA SENSOR ARRANGEMENT OF AN EXHAUST CHANNEL OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.08.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Berliner Ring 2
38440 Wolfsburg / DE
[2018/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Schemann, Stephan
Am Freibad West 85
38440 Wolfsburg / DE
02 / Sperling, Helmut
Carl-Goerderler-Ring 47
38518 Gifhorn / DE
03 / Schünke, Klemens
Wollschow 11
17326 Brüssow / DE
 [2018/08]
Representative(s)Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstraße 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[2018/08]
Application number, filing date17185257.708.08.2017
[2018/08]
Priority number, dateDE20161011524717.08.2016         Original published format: DE102016115247
[2018/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3284936
Date:21.02.2018
Language:DE
[2018/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3284936
Date:09.10.2019
Language:DE
[2019/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:F02D41/14
[2018/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/39]
Former [2018/08]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN EINER LAMBDASONDEN-ANORDNUNG IN EINEM ABGASKANAL EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS[2019/15]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR A LAMBDA SENSOR ARRANGEMENT OF AN EXHAUST CHANNEL OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE[2018/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UNE ARRANGEMENT DES SONDES LAMBDA DANS UN CONDUIT DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE[2019/15]
Former [2018/08]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN EINER LAMBDASONDEN-ANORDNUNG AN EINEM ABGASKANAL EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS
Former [2018/08]PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR UN AGENCEMENT DE CAPTEUR LAMBDA POUR UN SYSTÈME D'ÉCHAPPEMENT D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE
Examination procedure08.08.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.08.2018Examination requested  [2018/39]
26.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.07.2019Fee for grant paid
10.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US2010300068  (ENOMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US2007271904  (SHOUDA HIROFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1,5 *;
 [A]US2014156172  (SURNILLA GOPICHANDRA [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1,8 *;
 [A]DE102013223429  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-10 * claim 13 *