blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3301541

EP3301541 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, SEMICONDUCTOR SYSTEM, AND CONTROL METHOD OF SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.03.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.04.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.10.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  02.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 17.08.2022  [2022/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Renesas Electronics Corporation
2-24, Toyosu 3-chome
Koutou-ku
Tokyo 135-0061 / JP
[2018/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Fukuoka, Kazuki
c/o Renesas Electronics Corporation, 2-24, Toyosu
3-chome, Koutou-ku
Tokyo, 135-0061 / JP
02 / Uemura, Toshifumi
c/o Renesas Electronics Corporation, 2-24, Toyosu
3-chome, Koutou-ku
Tokyo, 135-0061 / JP
03 / Kitaji, Yuko
c/o Renesas Electronics Corporation, 2-24, Toyosu
3-chome, Koutou-ku
Tokyo, 135-0061 / JP
04 / Okazaki, Yosuke
c/o Renesas Electronics Corporation, 2-24, Toyosu
3-chome, Koutou-ku
Tokyo, 135-0061 / JP
05 / Murayama, Akira
c/o Renesas Electronics Corporation, 2-24, Toyosu
3-chome, Koutou-ku
Tokyo, 135-0061 / JP
 [2018/14]
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Maximiliansplatz 14
80333 München / DE
[2018/14]
Application number, filing date17185297.308.08.2017
[2018/14]
Priority number, dateJP2016019242030.09.2016         Original published format: JP 2016192420
[2018/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3301541
Date:04.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3301541
Date:06.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2018
ClassificationIPC:G06F1/26, G06F1/28, G01R31/28, H03K5/133, G06F1/24, H03K3/03
[2019/49]
CPC:
G01R31/2851 (EP,US); H03K17/28 (KR); H03K17/22 (CN);
G01R19/16552 (US); G01R19/16576 (CN); G01R31/31703 (US);
G01R31/3177 (US); G01R31/318328 (US); G01R31/31932 (US);
G01R31/31937 (US); G06F1/24 (EP,US); G06F1/28 (EP,KR,US);
H03K3/011 (CN); H03K3/0315 (EP,CN,US); H03K5/133 (US);
H03K2217/0027 (CN) (-)
Former IPC [2018/14]G06F1/26, G06F1/28, G01R31/28, H03K5/133
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/46]
Former [2018/14]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT, HALBLEITERSYSTEM UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN EINES HALBLEITERBAUELEMENTS[2018/14]
English:SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, SEMICONDUCTOR SYSTEM, AND CONTROL METHOD OF SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE[2018/14]
French:DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS, SYSTÈME À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS[2018/14]
Examination procedure04.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.10.2018Examination requested  [2018/46]
04.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2020Fee for grant paid
27.03.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.03.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)09.02.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.08.2017
AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CY06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
MK06.05.2020
MT06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
TR06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IE08.08.2020
LU08.08.2020
BE31.08.2020
CH31.08.2020
FR31.08.2020
LI31.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
[2022/33]
Former [2022/27]HU08.08.2017
AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CY06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
MT06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
TR06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IE08.08.2020
LU08.08.2020
BE31.08.2020
CH31.08.2020
FR31.08.2020
LI31.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/37]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IE08.08.2020
LU08.08.2020
BE31.08.2020
CH31.08.2020
FR31.08.2020
LI31.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/36]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
LU08.08.2020
BE31.08.2020
CH31.08.2020
FR31.08.2020
LI31.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/35]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
LU08.08.2020
CH31.08.2020
FR31.08.2020
LI31.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/24]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
LU08.08.2020
CH31.08.2020
LI31.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/20]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
LU08.08.2020
CH31.08.2020
LI31.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/18]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/10]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/09]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/08]AL06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/04]AL06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/01]FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2020/51]FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2020/50]FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2020/48]FI06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
NO06.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2020/47]LT06.05.2020
NO06.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
Former [2020/46]IS06.09.2020
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010327961  (IKENAGA YOSHIFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0105] * [I] 2-13,15;
 [XI]JP2011061518  (RENESAS ELECTRONICS CORP) [X] 1,14 * abstract * [I] 2-13,15;
 [XI]US2011267115  (YAMAMOTO KOSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0059] *[I] 2-13,15
by applicantJPH06296125
 JPH08274607
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.