Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3284696

EP3284696 - SELF-STANDING BAG WITH WALLS AND A FLOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.02.2019  [2019/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dittrich, Andreas
Bockhörn 18
27308 Kirchlinteln / DE
[2018/08]
Inventor(s)01 / DITTRICH, Andreas
Bockhöm 18
27308 Kirchlinteln / DE
02 / HILGER, Jens
Bürgermeister-Lange Strasse 6
27299 Langwedel / DE
 [2018/08]
Representative(s)Jabbusch, Matthias
Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 85
26131 Oldenburg / DE
[2018/08]
Application number, filing date17186170.114.08.2017
[2018/08]
Priority number, dateDE201620104542U18.08.2016         Original published format: DE 202016104542 U
[2018/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3284696
Date:21.02.2018
Language:DE
[2018/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:B65D75/58, B65D75/56
[2018/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STANDBODENBEUTEL MIT WANDUNGEN UND EINEM BODEN[2018/08]
English:SELF-STANDING BAG WITH WALLS AND A FLOOR[2018/08]
French:SACHET À FOND PLAT POURVU DE PAROIS ET D'UN FOND[2018/08]
Examination procedure22.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/07]
27.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2019/07]
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2003026188  (TATSUE SEIKO KK; MATSUYAMA HIDEO) [X] 1-4,6 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1,3,4 *;
 [X]US5649643  (RIDGEWAY DONNA [CA]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column 4, line 27 - line 61 * * column 5, line 43 - line 65; figures 1-5,9A-11; claim 1 *;
 [X]US2010038386  (PRITCHARD BARRY [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1A-3B *