Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3284696 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3284696



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 46
09.01.2019 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
27.09.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
26.02.2018 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
24.01.2018 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
03.01.2018 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.01.2018 European search opinion Search / examination 2
03.01.2018 European search report Search / examination 2
03.01.2018 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
20.12.2017 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
15.12.2017 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
15.12.2017 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
08.12.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
28.09.2017 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.09.2017 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
06.09.2017 Priority document Search / examination 9
14.08.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.08.2017 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
14.08.2017 Claims Search / examination 1
14.08.2017 Description Search / examination 5
14.08.2017 Drawings Search / examination 2
14.08.2017 Priority search results Search / examination 2
14.08.2017 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4