Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3284696


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.01.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
26.09.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
19.01.2018 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
16.08.2017 Change - representative