Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3443883

EP3443883 - METHOD AND DEVICES FOR PERFORMING EYE-RELATED MEASUREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Zeiss Vision International GmbH
Turnstrasse 27
73430 Aalen / DE
[2019/08]
Inventor(s)01 / BREUNINGER, Tobias
Böllstrasse 4
89542 Herbrechtingen / DE
02 / SEESSELBERG, Markus
Droste-Hülshoff-Weg 11
73431 Aalen / DE
03 / KUBITZA, Matthias
Hutsteinweg 16
73434 Aalen / DE
04 / WIDULLE, Frank
Westheimer Strasse 8
89233 Neu-Ulm / DE
 [2019/08]
Representative(s)Sticht, Andreas , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[2019/08]
Application number, filing date17186214.714.08.2017
[2019/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3443883
Date:20.02.2019
Language:DE
[2019/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61B3/032
[2019/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG AUGENBEZOGENER MESSUNGEN[2019/08]
English:METHOD AND DEVICES FOR PERFORMING EYE-RELATED MEASUREMENTS[2019/08]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'EFFECTUER DES MESURES RELATIVES À L' IL[2019/08]
Examination procedure16.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.07.2018Examination requested  [2019/08]
16.07.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2013201446  (HALL SIMON RICHARD GEOFFREY [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7-13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0037] , [0066] * [I] 3,5,6,14;
 [A]JP2003029198  (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2005069063
 DE102015101687
 EP20170153559
 EP20170153556
 EP20170174925