Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3454017

EP3454017 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING DATA FROM A TRANSMITTER TO A RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.09.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2019/11]
Inventor(s)01 / DÖNER, Çagdas
C/O Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2019/11]
Representative(s)Flint, Adam
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2019/11]
Application number, filing date17190219.008.09.2017
[2019/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3454017
Date:13.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:G01D5/00
[2019/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/43]
Former [2019/11]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DATEN VON EINEM SENDER ZU EINEM EMPFÄNGER[2019/11]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING DATA FROM A TRANSMITTER TO A RECEIVER[2019/11]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR TRANSFÉRER DES DONNÉES DEPUIS UN ÉMETTEUR VERS UN RÉCEPTEUR[2019/11]
Examination procedure13.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.09.2019Examination requested  [2019/43]
13.09.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010312504  (ROSSI VALERIO [IT], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0007] , [0019] , [0022] - paragraphs [0025] , [0028]; figures 2,3,5 * [I] 2;
 [X]EP0880679  (WOLFF PETER U [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7 * paragraphs [0014] , [0 49] , [0052] , [0056]; figure 6 *;
 [X]EP2492631  (BOEING CO [US]) [X] 4,6,7 * paragraphs [0029] , [0053] - paragraphs [0056] , [0070] , [0071]; figures 4-13 *;
 [X]US2006208744  (ZUSMAN GEORGE [US]) [X] 4,6,7 * paragraphs [0014] , [0028] - paragraphs [0029] , [0032]; figures 3,7 *